blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3285803

EP3285803 - METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MIGRAINE HEADACHE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.10.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.10.2024  [2024/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amgen Inc.
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SUN, Hong
2 Pardoe Road
Princeton, NJ 08540-2618 / US
02 / DUNAYEVICH, Eduardo
One Amgen Center Drive
c/o Patent Operations
MS 28-2-C
Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US
03 / LENZ, Robert A.
908 Ravensbury Street
Westlake Village, California 91361 / US
04 / VARGAS, Gabriel
1725 Madera Street
Berkeley CA 94707 / US
 [2019/51]
Former [2018/09]01 / SUN, Hong
29412 Oakpath Drive
Agoura Hills, California 91301 / US
02 / DUNAYEVICH, Eduardo
One Amgen Center Drive
c/o Patent Operations
MS 28-2-C
Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US
03 / LENZ, Robert A.
908 Ravensbury Street
Westlake Village, California 91361 / US
04 / VARGAS, Gabriel
555 Timberwood Avenue
Thousand Oaks, California 91360 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2018/09]
Application number, filing date15754071.710.08.2015
[2018/09]
WO2015US44479
Priority number, dateUS201562152708P24.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562152708 P
[2018/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016171742
Date:27.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3285803
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3285803
Date:18.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/00, C07K16/28
[2019/28]
CPC:
C07K16/2869 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K16/28 (IL); A61K39/395 (KR,RU);
A61M5/20 (RU); A61P25/06 (EP,IL,RU); A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/09]A61K39/395, C07K16/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/09]
Extension statesBA23.11.2017
ME23.11.2017
Validation statesMA23.11.2017
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON MIGRÄNEKOPFSCHMERZEN[2018/09]
English:METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MIGRAINE HEADACHE[2018/09]
French:MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT OU DE PRÉVENTION DE MIGRAINES[2018/09]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2017National basic fee paid 
23.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/09]
23.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2019Fee for grant paid
08.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19212188.7  / EP3653225
Opposition(s)21.09.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMT18.12.2019
[2024/42]
Cited inInternational search[IDA]WO2010075238  (AMGEN INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO2012162257  (ALDERBIO HOLDINGS LLC [US], et al);
by applicantUS4399216
 US4740461
 US4816567
 US4912040
 WO9004036
 EP0367566
 US4959455
 US4965195
 US4968607
 WO9110741
 EP0460846
 WO9203918
 WO9222646
 WO9301227
 EP0546073
 WO9402602
 US5530101
 US5545807
 US5545806
 US5569825
 WO9633735
 US5585089
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5661016
 EP0546073
 US5693762
 US5693761
 WO9824893
 US5770429
 US5789650
 US5814318
 US5874299
 US5877397
 US6162963
 US6180370
 US6255458
 US6270964
 US6300129
 US6673986
 US6713610
 US2006142273
 WO2007054809
 WO2007076336
 US7569578
 US7625901
 WO2010075238
 US7754732
 US7772244
 US7842808
 US7947677
 WO2011156324
 US8143266
 US8168592
 WO2012162243
 US8372859
 US8377955
 US8569291
 US8685965
 WO2014144632
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.