blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3134095

EP3134095 - IMPROVED METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING ADOPTIVE CELL THERAPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.03.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.03.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Opposition withdrawnpublished on 26.06.2024  [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
2seventy bio, Inc.
60 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2021/44]
Former [2020/17]For all designated states
Bluebird Bio, Inc.
60 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Former [2017/20]For all designated states
Bluebird Bio, Inc.
60 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Former [2017/18]For all designated states
Bluebird Bio, Inc.
60 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
Former [2017/09]For all designated states
Bluebird Bio, Inc.
150 Second Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MORGAN, Richard
PO Box 1254
Center Harbor NH 03226-1254 / US
02 / FRIEDMAN, Kevin
4 Clover Circle
Medford, Massachusetts 02176 / US
03 / MAIER, Dawn
29 Crestwood Road
North Reading, Massachusetts 01864 / US
 [2017/13]
Former [2017/11]01 / MORGAN, Richard
6922 Tolling Bells Court
Columbia, Maryland 21044 / US
02 / FRIEDMAN, Kevin
4 Clover Circle
Medford, Massachusetts 02176 / US
03 / MAIER, Dawn
29 Crestwood Road
North Reading, Massachusetts 01864 / US
Former [2017/09]01 / MORGAN, Richard
6922 Tolling Bells Court
Columbia, Maryland 21044 / US
02 / FRIEDMAN, Kevin
10 Museum Way 1123
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02141 / US
03 / MAIER, Dawn
103 Lowell Road
Apt. 105
North Reading, Massachusetts 01864 / US
Representative(s)Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Straße 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/17]Donald, Jenny Susan
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2017/09]Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
Application number, filing date15783117.324.04.2015
[2017/09]
WO2015US27518
Priority number, dateUS201461984558P25.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461984558 P
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015164745
Date:29.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3134095
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3134095
Date:22.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K35/12, A61K35/17, A61K38/17, C12N5/0783, C12N5/16, C12N7/00, C12N15/86
[2017/38]
CPC:
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US); A61K35/17 (KR); A61K38/177 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K40/11 (EP,IL,RU,US); A61K40/31 (EP,IL,RU,US); A61K40/4211 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K40/4215 (EP,IL,RU,US); A61P29/00 (EP,IL); A61P31/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL); A61P37/04 (EP,IL); A61P37/06 (EP,IL);
C12N15/86 (IL,US); C12N5/10 (RU); C12N7/00 (IL,US);
A61K2035/124 (IL,US); C07K14/7051 (EP); C07K2319/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP); C12N2501/2301 (IL,US); C12N2501/998 (IL,US);
C12N2740/10043 (IL,US); C12N2740/15043 (IL,US); C12N2799/021 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2799/027 (EP,IL,US); C12N2810/855 (EP,IL,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/09]A61K35/17, C12N5/0783, C12N5/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ADOPTIVER ZELLTHERAPIEN[2017/09]
English:IMPROVED METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING ADOPTIVE CELL THERAPIES[2017/09]
French:PROCÉDÉS AMÉLIORÉS DE PRODUCTION DE THÉRAPIES REPOSANT SUR DES CELLULES ADOPTIVES[2017/09]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2016National basic fee paid 
14.11.2016Search fee paid 
14.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/09]
14.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.12.2019Fee for grant paid
03.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.03.2020Information about intention to grant a patent
11.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20170239.6  / EP3738597
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.01.2021  21.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Dehns Limited
10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 02  21.01.2021  26.01.2021  WITHDRAWN
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Opponent's representative
Chiappinelli, Susan Ann
GSK
Legal & Compliance - Global Patents
79 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1DG / GB
 03  22.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2024/26]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2021  21.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Dehns Limited
10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  21.01.2021  26.01.2021  WITHDRAWN
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Opponent's representative
Chiappinelli, Susan Ann
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 03  22.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Former [2022/08]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2021  21.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Dehns Limited
10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  21.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Opponent's representative
Chiappinelli, Susan Ann
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 03  22.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Former [2021/15]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2021  21.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Dehns Limited
10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  21.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Anna
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 03  22.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Former [2021/09]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2021  21.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Dehns Limited
10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  21.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Anna
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 03  22.01.2021  26.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
Former [2021/08]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2021  21.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Dehns Limited
10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  21.01.2021   
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Anna
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
09.02.2021Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.08.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.01.2023Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2023Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.02.2023Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.05.2023Appeal received No.  T0868/23
10.05.2023Payment of appeal fee
10.07.2023Statement of grounds filed
17.06.2025Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.11.2018Request for further processing filed
05.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.11.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2012140130  (IMMUNICUM AB, et al);
 [XY]WO2013126712  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]);
 [XY]WO2014039523  (CELLECTIS [FR]);
International search[Y]US7754482  (RILEY JAMES L [US], et al);
 [XY]US7977095  (BONYHADI MARK [US], et al);
OppositionUS2008274091
 WO2012079000
 US2013280220
 US2012301447
 WO2013126712
 WO2014048920
 WO2014099671
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.