blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3224275

EP3224275 - ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES COMPRISING A TNF FAMILY LIGAND TRIMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2021
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / AMANN, Maria
Neugutstrasse 55
8600 Duebendorf / CH
02 / BRUENKER, Peter
Burgwiesenstrasse 3c
8335 Hittnau / CH
03 / CLAUS, Christina
Limmatauweg 3
5408 Ennetbaden / CH
04 / FERRARA KOLLER, Claudia
Haenibueel 13
6300 Zug / CH
05 / GRAU-RICHARDS, Sandra
Breitestrasse 16
8903 Birmensdorf ZH / CH
06 / KLEIN, Christian
Chapfstrasse 26B
8906 Bonstetten / CH
07 / LEVITSKY, Viktor
Wulikerstrasse 10
8903 Biermensdorf / CH
08 / MOESSNER, Ekkehard
Felsenburgweg 5
8280 Kreuzlingen / CH
09 / REGULA, Joerg Thomas
Innerkoflerstrasse 17 B
81377 Muenchen / DE
10 / UMAÑA, Pablo
Felsenrainstrasse 28
8832 Wollerau / CH
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Klostermeyer-Rauber, Dörte, et al
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Patent Department
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2017/40]Klostermeyer-Rauber, Dörte, et al
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Corporate Law Patents (CLP) Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date15797922.013.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015EP76528
Priority number, dateEP2014019326014.11.2014         Original published format: EP 14193260
EP2015018373603.09.2015         Original published format: EP 15183736
EP2015018814202.10.2015         Original published format: EP 15188142
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016075278
Date:19.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3224275
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3224275
Date:04.03.2020
Language:EN
[2020/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/395, C07K16/30, C07K16/40, C07K14/705, C07K16/28
[2019/35]
CPC:
C07K16/40 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K38/00 (IL,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,IL,US); A61K47/6849 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/70575 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K14/70596 (IL,US); C07K16/2815 (IL,US);
C07K16/2896 (IL,US); C07K16/3007 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K16/46 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (IL,KR); C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/35 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/522 (IL,US); C07K2317/524 (IL,US); C07K2317/526 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (IL,US); C07K2317/60 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2319/33 (IL,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/40]C07K14/705, A61K47/50, C07K16/46, C12N15/62, C07K16/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMA14.06.2017
MD14.06.2017
TitleGerman:ANTIGENBINDENDE MOLEKÜLE MIT EINEM LIGANDENTRIMER DER TNF-FAMILIE[2017/40]
English:ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES COMPRISING A TNF FAMILY LIGAND TRIMER[2017/40]
French:MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON D'ANTIGÈNE COMPRENANT UN TRIMÈRE DE LIGAND DE LA FAMILLE TNF[2019/35]
Former [2017/40]MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE COMPRENANT UN LIGAND TRIMÈRIQUE DE LA FAMILLE DU TNF
Entry into regional phase14.06.2017National basic fee paid 
14.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
06.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2020Fee for grant paid
21.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18207248.8  / EP3489256
EP20158607.0  / EP3738609
Opposition(s)07.12.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.03.2020
CY04.03.2020
EE04.03.2020
LV04.03.2020
MC04.03.2020
MK04.03.2020
MT04.03.2020
SM04.03.2020
IS04.07.2020
LU13.11.2020
[2022/31]
Former [2022/28]CY04.03.2020
EE04.03.2020
LV04.03.2020
MC04.03.2020
MT04.03.2020
SM04.03.2020
IS04.07.2020
LU13.11.2020
Former [2021/33]EE04.03.2020
LV04.03.2020
MC04.03.2020
SM04.03.2020
IS04.07.2020
LU13.11.2020
Former [2021/31]EE04.03.2020
LV04.03.2020
MC04.03.2020
SM04.03.2020
IS04.07.2020
Former [2020/50]EE04.03.2020
LV04.03.2020
SM04.03.2020
IS04.07.2020
Former [2020/48]LV04.03.2020
SM04.03.2020
IS04.07.2020
Former [2020/46]LV04.03.2020
IS04.07.2020
Former [2020/38]LV04.03.2020
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2010010051  (APOGENIX GMBH [DE], et al);
 [I]AU2011265482B  (PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES OREGON [US]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.