blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3086637

EP3086637 - NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HAVING A HUMANIZED CLUSTER OF DIFFERENTIATION 47 GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
[2016/44]
Inventor(s)01 / GURER, Cagan
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
02 / IOFFE, Ella
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
03 / MUJICA, Alexander
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
04 / THURSTON, Gavin
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
 [2016/44]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/01]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2016/44]Nicholls, James Ronald
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date15813960.025.11.2015
[2016/44]
WO2015US62614
Priority number, dateUS201462087992P05.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462087992 P
[2016/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016089692
Date:09.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3086637
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3086637
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.06.2016
ClassificationIPC:A01K67/027, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12N15/85, G01N33/50
[2018/29]
CPC:
A01K67/0278 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US); A61K49/0008 (CN,IL,RU); A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
C07K14/4703 (EP,IL,US); C07K14/705 (IL,US); C07K14/70503 (CN,IL,US);
C07K14/70596 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,US); C12N15/63 (US);
C12N15/8509 (IL,KR,RU,US); G01N33/5011 (EP,IL,RU,US); G01N33/5014 (EP,IL,RU,US);
G01N33/5055 (EP,IL,RU,US); G01N33/5088 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US); A01K2207/12 (IL,US);
A01K2207/15 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A01K2217/05 (CN,IL); A01K2217/052 (IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,IL,KR,US); A01K2217/15 (EP,IL,KR,US); A01K2227/105 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2267/03 (CN,IL); A01K2267/0331 (EP,IL,KR,US); A01K2267/0381 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,IL,US); C07K2319/02 (EP,IL,US); G01N2333/70596 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Former IPC [2016/44]A01K67/027, G01N33/50, C07K14/705
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NICHTHUMANE TIERE MIT HUMANISIERTEM CLUSTER DES DIFFERENZIERUNGS-47-GENS[2016/44]
English:NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HAVING A HUMANIZED CLUSTER OF DIFFERENTIATION 47 GENE[2016/44]
French:ANIMAUX NON HUMAINS POSSÉDANT UN GÈNE CD47 HUMANISÉ[2016/44]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2016National basic fee paid 
26.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
24.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2018Fee for grant paid
23.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18207075.5  / EP3466255
EP20215046.2  / EP3850946
EP23192469.7
Opposition(s)03.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2007033221  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2013063556  (REGENERON PHARMA [US]);
 [X]WO2013144165  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]);
 [XY]WO2014071397  (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al);
 [A]WO2014093678  (FRAZIER WILLIAM A [US], et al);
by applicantUS5670356
 US5874304
 US6586251
 US7294754
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.