EP3181560 - PYRIDINE AMIDOPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Allist Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. 5th Floor, Building 1 1118 Halei Road & 1227 Zhangheng Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai, 201203 / CN | [2020/18] |
Former [2017/25] | For all designated states Shanghai Allist Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 5th Floor, 1118 Halei Road Zhangilang High-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Huibing 5th floor, Building 1 1118 Halei Road & 1227 Zhangheng Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Huayong 5th floor, Building 1 1118 Halei Road & 1227 Zhangheng Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shuhui 5th floor, Building 1 1118 Halei Road & 1227 Zhangheng Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
WU, Yong 5th floor, Building 1 1118 Halei Road & 1227 Zhangheng Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2020/26] |
Former [2017/25] | 01 /
LUO, Huibing 5th floor 1118 Halei Road Zhangjiang High-tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Huayong 5th floor 1118 Halei Road Zhangjiang High-tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
03 /
WANG, Shuhui 5th floor 1118 Halei Road Zhangjiang High-tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
04 /
WU, Yong 5th floor 1118 Halei Road Zhangjiang High-tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/48] |
Former [2017/25] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 15828199.8 | 29.07.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015CN00540 | Priority number, date | CN201410365911 | 29.07.2014 Original published format: CN201410365911 | [2017/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016015453 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3181560 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3181560 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/02, A61P43/00, C07D401/14, A61K31/506, C07D403/14, C07D471/04, A61P35/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/404 (KR);
A61K31/444 (KR);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | C07D403/14, A61K31/506, A61P35/00, C07D401/14, C07D471/04 | ||
Former IPC [2017/25] | C07D403/14, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIDINAMIDOPYRIMIDINDERIVAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/25] | English: | PYRIDINE AMIDOPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF | [2017/25] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE PYRIDINE AMIDOPYRIMIDINE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2017 | Translation filed | 20.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 20.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2015 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | TR | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | LU | 29.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
TR | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013053409 (BUTTERWORTH SAM [GB], et al) [Y] 1-20 * [0010]-[0014]; [0025]-[0026]; [0249]; [0448]-[0452]; examples, e.g. Examples 59, 60; see also the Intermediate compounds at [0700] and [0708]; claims *; | [Y] - RICHARD A WARD ET AL, "Structure- and Reactivity-Based Development of Covalent Inhibitors of the Activating and Gatekeeper Mutant Forms of the Epidermal Growth Factor Receptor (EGFR)", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 56, no. 17, doi:10.1021/JM400822Z, ISSN 0022-2623, (20130912), pages 7025 - 7048, (20130809), XP002734712 [Y] 1-20 * page 7031, Table 4; page 7032, Table 6; pages 7035- 7036, Table 9, entry for compound 38 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm400822z | International search | [A]CN102482277 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]CN103702990 (ASTRAZENECA AB) [X] 1-17, 19, 20 * claims 1-16, description, page 2, lines 1-7, embodiments 1-60, page 82, intermediate 100 and 101, page 91, intermediate 129 and 130 (alternative synthesis) *; | [PX]CN104761544 (CS THERAPEUTICS INC) [PX] 1-20 * description, page 18; compound (II), page 35, line 1 to page 46, line 13 * |