EP3186395 - ENGRAFTMENT OF STEM CELLS WITH A COMBINATION OF AN AGENT THAT TARGETS STEM CELLS AND MODULATION OF IMMUNOREGULATORY SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2017/27] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University Office of The General Counsel Building 170, 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIZURU, Judith, A. 218 Cowper Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 02 /
WEISKOPF, Kipp Andrew 745 Menlo Avenue Unit 10 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
RING, Aaron Michael 2253 Williams Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 04 /
CHHABRA, Akanksha 926 Grove Street 6 San Francisco, California 94117 / US | 05 /
SCHNORR, Peter 35 Fieldstone Farm Road Sudbury, Massachusetts 01776 / US | 06 /
WEISSMAN Irving L. 747 Santa Ynez Street Stanford, California 94305 / US | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/13] |
Former [2017/27] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15835482.9 | 26.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015US46976 | Priority number, date | US201462041989P | 26.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462041989 P | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016033201 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3186395 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3186395 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3186395 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61K39/395, C07K16/30, A61K35/28, A61K38/17 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A61K35/28 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61K38/1793 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K16/2896 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/27] | C12Q1/68, A61K39/395, C07K16/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | TRANSPLANTATION VON STAMMZELLEN MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS EINEM AUF STAMMZELLEN ABZIELENDEN WIRKSTOFF UND MODULATION VON IMMUNREGULATORISCHER SIGNALISIERUNG | [2017/27] | English: | ENGRAFTMENT OF STEM CELLS WITH A COMBINATION OF AN AGENT THAT TARGETS STEM CELLS AND MODULATION OF IMMUNOREGULATORY SIGNALING | [2017/27] | French: | GREFFE DE CELLULES SOUCHES AVEC COMBINAISON D'UN AGENT CIBLANT DES CELLULES SOUCHES ET MODULATION DE LA SIGNALISATION IMMUNORÉGULATRICE | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 27.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19198976.3 / EP3656869 | EP20206393.9 / EP3822364 | EP23172261.2 / EP4257145 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2020
01.03.2022
WITHDRAWN Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2020
01.03.2022
WITHDRAWN Hoffman Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Hoffman Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE | 07.07.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.11.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.03.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.07.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.02.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | HR | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009191202 (JAMIESON CATRIONA HELEN M [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011034969 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2010226927 (WEISSMAN IRVING L [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013056352 (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2013109752 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) | by applicant | WO9814592 | US2002012903 | US6498018 | US6541255 | US6638501 | US2009191202 | US2010226927 | US2010239579 | WO2011034969 | WO2011143624 | WO2013056352 | WO2013109752 | Opposition | WO2004002425 | WO2008067115 | WO2009091601 | US2009191202 | WO2013109752 | WO2015138600 | WO2016205042 |