EP3227432 - CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS TARGETING B-CELL MATURATION ANTIGEN AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.12.2024 [2024/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | For all designated states Eureka Therapeutics, Inc. 5858 Horton Street, Suite 362 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRENT JENS, Renier, J. 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Eric, L. 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | 03 /
LIU, Cheng 4 Commodore Drive D334 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/41] |
Former [2017/41] | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15864826.1 | 04.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015US64112 | Priority number, date | US201462088309P | 05.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462088309 P | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016090320 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227432 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3227432 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K14/705, A61K35/17, A61P35/00, C07K14/725 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K40/11 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K40/31 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K40/4202 (KR);
A61K40/4211 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K40/4215 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61P35/02 (KR);
C07K14/70521 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K2239/48 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | C12N5/07, C12P21/08, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGEN DAS B-ZELL-REIFUNGSANTIGEN GERICHTETE CHIMÄRE ANTIGENREZEPTOREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/41] | English: | CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS TARGETING B-CELL MATURATION ANTIGEN AND USES THEREOF | [2017/41] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS ANTIGÉNIQUES CHIMÉRIQUES CIBLANT L'ANTIGÈNE DE MATURATION DES CELLULES B ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 30.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23198934.4 / EP4310097 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SI | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | LU | 04.12.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/49] |
Former [2024/40] | EE | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
MC | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
LU | 04.12.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | EE | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | EE | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013072406 (AMGEN RES MUNICH GMBH [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2013154760 (US HEALTH [US]); | [A]WO2014089335 (AMGEN INC [US]); | [E]WO2016090327 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al); | International search | [Y]WO2012066058 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al); | [XY]WO2013154760 (US HEALTH [US]) | by applicant | US4956778 | US5091513 | US5132405 | US5399346 | US2005196754 | US7446190 | US8389282 | WO2013154760 | WO2014089335 | WO2014087010 |