blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3056203

EP3056203 - CONJUGATES OF CC-1065 ANALOGS AND BIFUNCTIONAL LINKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syntarga B.V.
Toernooiveld 1
6525 ED Nijmegen / NL
[2016/33]
Inventor(s)01 / BEUSKER, Patrick Henry
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
02 / COUMANS, Rudy Gerardus Elisabeth
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
03 / ELGERSMA, Ronald Christiaan
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
04 / MENGE, Wiro Michael Petrus Bernardus
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
05 / JOOSTEN, Johannes Albertus Frederikus
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
06 / SPIJKER, Henri Johannes
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
07 / GROOT de, Franciscus Marinus Hendrikus
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
 [2016/33]
Representative(s)van der Sterren-Mol, Josephine, et al
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
P.O. Box 7071
6503 GN Nijmegen / NL
[2017/50]
Former [2016/33]van der Sterren-Mol, Josephine, et al
Synthon BV IP Research P.O. Box 7071
6503 GN Nijmegen / NL
Application number, filing date16154533.021.04.2011
[2016/33]
Priority number, dateUS20100326437P21.04.2010         Original published format: US 326437 P
US20100421824P10.12.2010         Original published format: US 421824 P
[2016/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3056203
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3056203
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/437, C07D471/04, A61K47/68, A61P35/00
[2017/30]
CPC:
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,RU,US); C07D471/04 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K38/385 (EP,US);
A61K39/44 (US); A61K47/545 (EP,US); A61K47/546 (KR);
A61K47/56 (KR); A61K47/60 (EP,US); A61K47/64 (US);
A61K47/643 (EP,US); A61K47/646 (US); A61K47/65 (EP,US);
A61K47/6803 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K47/6851 (US); A61P35/00 (EP,RU);
A61P35/04 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2016/33]A61K31/437, A61P35/00, A61K47/48, C07D471/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/40]
Former [2016/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KONJUGATE VON CC-1065 ANALOGA UND BIFUNKTIONELLE LINKER[2016/33]
English:CONJUGATES OF CC-1065 ANALOGS AND BIFUNCTIONAL LINKERS[2016/33]
French:CONJUGUÉS DE LIEURS BIFONCTIONNELS CC-1065 ET ANALOGUES[2016/33]
Examination procedure26.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/45]
10.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2017Fee for grant paid
01.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11720340.6  / EP2560645
Opposition(s)14.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
10.03.2017Request for further processing filed
10.03.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.03.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
MK13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
LU21.04.2018
[2020/34]
Former [2020/31]EE13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
MK13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
LU21.04.2018
Former [2019/13]EE13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
LU21.04.2018
Former [2019/08]EE13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
LU21.04.2018
Former [2018/52]EE13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
Former [2018/37]EE13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
Former [2018/25]LV13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0656360  (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al);
 [A]WO02096910  (COULTER PHARMACEUTICAL INC A W [US], et al);
 [A]WO2005112919  (MEDAREX INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO2007038658  (MEDAREX INC [US], et al);
 [AD]WO2007089149  (SYNTARGA BV [NL], et al);
 [AP]WO2010062171  (SYNTARGA BV [NL], et al);
by applicantEP0154445
 WO8804659
 WO9002746
 WO9116324
 WO9404535
 WO9531971
 US5475092
 US5585499
 WO9707097
 WO9712862
 US5646298
 WO9732850
 WO9744000
 WO9745411
 WO9811101
 US5739350
 WO9825898
 WO9852925
 US5843937
 US5846545
 WO9919298
 WO0183482
 WO0183448
 WO0230894
 WO02059122
 WO02067937
 WO02067930
 WO02068412
 WO02083180
 WO03022806
 WO03086318
 WO2004043493
 WO2004101767
 WO2005103040
 WO2005112919
 WO2006002895
 WO2006043839
 WO2006110476
 WO2007018431
 WO2007038658
 WO2007051081
 WO2007059404
 WO2007089149
 WO2008083312
 WO2008103693
 WO2009017394
 WO2009026274
 WO2009064908
 WO2009073533
 WO2009073524
 WO2009073546
 US2009162372
 WO2009134977
 WO2010062171
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.