blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3093291

EP3093291 - DISUBSTITUTED OCTAHY - DROPYRROLO [3,4-C]PYRROLES AS OREXIN RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.04.2020  [2020/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
[2017/29]
Former [2016/46]For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Inventor(s)01 / CHAI, Wenying
4318 Corte Al Fresco
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / LETAVIC, Michael, A.
4379 Mistral Place
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
03 / LY, Kiev, S.
P.O. Box 927992
San Diego, CA 92192 / US
04 / PIPPEL, Daniel, J.
12795 Via Cortina
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
05 / RUDOLPH, Dale, A.
12721 Alondra Court
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
06 / STROTHER, Kathleen, C.
3429 Borreson Street
San Diego, CA 92117 / US
07 / SAVALL, Brad, M.
9512 Ronda Avenue
San Diego, CA 92123 / US
08 / SHAH, Chandravadan, R.
14213 Dalhouside Road
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
09 / SHIREMAN, Brock, T.
12625 Birchbrook Court
Poway, CA 92064 / US
10 / SOYODE-JOHNSON, Akinola
8530 Costa Verde Blvd. 1409
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
11 / STOCKING, Emily, M.
310 Melrose Avenue
Encinitas, CA 92024 / US
12 / SWANSON, Devin, M.
3121 Morning Way
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
 [2016/46]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/46]
Application number, filing date16163733.521.10.2010
[2016/46]
Priority number, dateUS20090254509P23.10.2009         Original published format: US 254509 P
[2016/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3093291
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3093291
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/428, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4709, A61K31/498, A61K31/506, A61K31/53, A61K31/5377, C07D487/04
[2018/25]
CPC:
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/407 (KR); A61K31/4192 (KR);
A61K31/428 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/4439 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/4709 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/53 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US); A61P1/00 (EP); A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP); A61P1/16 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP); A61P25/14 (EP); A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP); A61P25/20 (EP); A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP); A61P3/06 (EP); A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); A61P5/50 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP); A61P9/06 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2016/46]C07D487/04, A61K31/407, A61P25/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
Former [2016/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA16.05.2017
ME16.05.2017
TitleGerman:DISUBSTITUIERTE OCTAHY-DROPYRROLO [3,4-C]PYRROLE ALS OREXINREZEPTORMODULATOREN[2016/46]
English:DISUBSTITUTED OCTAHY - DROPYRROLO [3,4-C]PYRROLES AS OREXIN RECEPTOR MODULATORS[2016/46]
French:DISUBSTITUÉ OCTAHY - DROPYRROLO [3,4-C] PYRROLES EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DU RÉCEPTEUR DE L'OREXINE[2016/46]
Examination procedure04.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/25]
18.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2019Fee for grant paid
25.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10773477.4  / EP2491038
Divisional application(s)EP19172579.5  / EP3581575
Opposition(s)11.02.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004004733  (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al);
 [A]WO2009016286  (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al);
 [A]WO2009037394  (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al)
by applicantWO0181347
 US2002019388
 WO03002561
 WO03051872
 WO2004033418
 WO2004041791
 US2005065178
 US2005101602
 US2006258672
 WO2006124897
 WO2006123121
 WO2007126935
 WO2007126934
 WO2008008551
 WO2008008517
 WO2008008518
 US2008132490
 WO2008067121
 WO2008143856
 WO2009022311
 WO2009058238
 WO2009081197
 WO2009124956
 WO2010017260
 WO2010048012
 WO2010048017
 WO2010048014
 WO2010048010
 WO2010048013
 WO2010051238
 WO2010051237
 WO2010051236
 WO2010060472
 WO2010060471
 WO2010060470
 WO2010063663
 WO2010063662
 US2010160344
 US2010160345
 WO2010072722
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.