EP3090773 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PUNCTURING A CAPSULE TO RELEASE A POWDERED MEDICAMENT THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Civitas Therapeutics, Inc. 190 Everett Ave. Chelsea, MA 02150 / US | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLWANGER, Colleen 6 Fair Oaks Drive Lincoln, RI 02865 / US | 02 /
NOBLE, Brian 40 Slough Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 03 /
COKER, Tim 19 Brackenwood Drive Nashua, NH 03062 / US | 04 /
PLUNKETT, Sean 50 Spring Road Westborough, MA 01581 / US | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2016/45] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16167547.5 | 03.12.2013 | [2016/45] | Priority number, date | US201261733117P | 04.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261733117 P | US201213719598 | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US201213719598 | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3090773 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3090773 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3090773 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
A61M15/0028 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61M15/0035 (EP,RU,US);
A61M15/0041 (EP,RU,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61M2202/064 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/064, A61M2202/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2016/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 01.08.2017 | ME | 01.08.2017 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR PUNKTIERUNG EINER KAPSEL ZUR FREISETZUNG EINES PULVERFÖRMIGEN MEDIKAMENTS DARAUS | [2016/45] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PUNCTURING A CAPSULE TO RELEASE A POWDERED MEDICAMENT THEREFROM | [2016/45] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE PERFORER UNE CAPSULE POUR LIBÉRER UN MÉDICAMENT EN POUDRE À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI | [2016/45] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13812285.8 / EP2928530 | Divisional application(s) | EP19197088.8 / EP3607986 | EP25156645.1 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2020
ADMISSIBLE Beck Greener LLP 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2020/30] | 30.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.11.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.07.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.02.2022 | 20.08.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.08.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/01] | 23.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2013 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | LU | 03.12.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.12.2013 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.12.2013 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.12.2013 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3518992 (ALTOUNYAN ROGER EDWARD COLLING, et al); | [X]WO02083220 (ADVANCED INHALATION RES INC [US]); | [XI]US2003131847 (NICCOLAI FABRIZIO [IT]); | [X]WO03080163 (ADVANCED INHALATION RES INC [US]); | [X]US2004206350 (ALSTON WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [XI]US2005056280 (ALSTON WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [X]WO2008156586 (ALKERMES INC [US], et al); | [I]US2010300440 (DEBOECK ARTHUR [US], et al); | [I]US2011220106 (GANEM CHARLES F [US], et al); | [X]US2012111325 (HRKACH JEFFREY S [US]) | by applicant | US6732732 | US2009025721 | Opposition | EP0784969 | WO03080163 | WO03079992 | US2004011360 | US2004159322 | US2005056280 |