blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3150580

EP3150580 - ARYL- OR HETEROARYL-SUBSTITUTED BENZENE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Epizyme, Inc.
400 Technology Square, 4th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2017/14]
Inventor(s)01 / KUNTZ, Kevin Wayne
8 New Village Road
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
02 / CHESWORTH, Richard
584 Strawberry Hill Road
Concord, MA 01742 / US
03 / DUNCAN, Kenneth William
132 Roosevelt Avenue
Norwood, MA 02062 / US
04 / KEILHACK, Heike
3 Falmouth Street
Belmont, MA 02478 / US
05 / WARHOLIC, Natalie
81 Strathmore Road
Apartment 32
Brighton, MA 02135 / US
06 / KLAUS, Christine
29 Weyham Road
Weymouth, MA 02191 / US
07 / SEKI, Masashi
Tsukuba Research Laboratories
Eisai Co. Ltd.
5-1-3 Tokodai
Tsukubashi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP
08 / SHIROTORI, Syuji
Tsukuba Research Laboratories
Eisai Co. Ltd.
5-1-3 Tokodai
Tsukubashi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP
09 / KAWANO, Satoshi
Tsukuba Research Laboratories
Eisai Co. Ltd.
5-1-3 Tokodai
Tsukubashi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP
10 / WIGLE, Timothy James Nelson
111 Marivista Avenue
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
11 / KNUTSON, Sarah Kathleen
24 Bay State Road
Unit 22
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
 [2017/14]
Representative(s)Russell, Tim, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/14]
Application number, filing date16172386.113.04.2012
[2017/14]
Priority number, dateUS201161474821P13.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161474821 P
US201161499595P21.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161499595 P
[2017/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3150580
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3150580
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2017
ClassificationIPC:C07D213/64, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D491/08, C07D491/107, A61K31/4412, A61K31/444, A61P35/00
[2017/14]
CPC:
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,US); C07D213/64 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D405/14 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4412 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K31/443 (EP,US); A61K31/4433 (EP,US);
A61K31/4436 (EP,US); A61K31/4439 (EP,US); A61K31/444 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US); A61K31/4709 (EP,US); A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US); A61K31/551 (EP,US); A61K31/553 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR); A61P35/02 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D213/81 (CN); C07D401/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D401/14 (CN,KR);
C07D405/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D409/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D413/12 (CN,IL,RU,US);
C07D413/14 (KR); C07D417/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D491/08 (CN,IL,RU,US);
C07D491/107 (CN,IL,KR,US); C07D498/08 (IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/45]
Former [2017/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ARYL- ODER HETEROARYLSUBSTITUIERTE BENZOLVERBINDUNGEN[2017/14]
English:ARYL- OR HETEROARYL-SUBSTITUTED BENZENE COMPOUNDS[2017/14]
French:COMPOSÉS DE BENZÈNE HÉTÉROARYL- OU ARYL- SUBSTITUÉS[2017/14]
Examination procedure01.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/45]
13.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
19.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2018Fee for grant paid
05.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12719529.5  / EP2697199
Divisional application(s)EP18200713.8  / EP3486234
EP21175920.4  / EP3943485
EP23217912.7
Opposition(s)18.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
19.01.2018Request for further processing filed
19.01.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YP]WO2011140325  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al);
 [YP]WO2011140324  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al);
 [YP]WO2012005805  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al);
by applicantUS4522811
 US5763263
 US7563589
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.