blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3133396

EP3133396 - METHODS OF TREATMENT USING AMMONIA-SCAVENGING DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Immedica Pharma AB
Norrtullsgatan 15
113 29 Stockholm / SE
[2019/20]
Former [2017/28]For all designated states
Horizon Therapeutics, LLC
150 S. Saunders Road
Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US
Former [2017/08]For all designated states
Horizon Therapeutics, Inc.
2000 Sierra Point Parkway
Suite 400
Brisbane, CA 94005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHARSCHMIDT, Bruce
Hyperion Therapeutics
601 Gateway Boulevard
Suite 200
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
 [2017/08]
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
Löjtnantsgatan 21
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2017/08]Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date16176456.807.01.2009
[2017/08]
Priority number, dateUS20080093234P29.08.2008         Original published format: US 93234 P
[2017/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3133396
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3133396
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2016
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/50
[2017/08]
CPC:
A61K31/19 (EP,GB,US); A61K31/216 (US); A61K31/192 (GB,US);
A61P13/00 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP); G01N33/6812 (EP,GB,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,GB,US); G01N2800/085 (EP,US); G01N2800/347 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/39]
Former [2017/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON AMMONIAKREINIGENDEN WIRKSTOFFEN[2017/08]
English:METHODS OF TREATMENT USING AMMONIA-SCAVENGING DRUGS[2017/08]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT À L'AIDE DE MÉDICAMENTS DÉSACTIVANT L'AMMONIAC[2017/08]
Examination procedure27.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/39]
13.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2018Fee for grant paid
20.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09739263.3  / EP2330892
Divisional application(s)EP18192516.5   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 05.10.2018
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201709   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2017
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.