blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3108886

EP3108886 - CONJUGATES OF CC-1065 ANALOGS AND BIFUNCTIONAL LINKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2021
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.05.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024  [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syntarga B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
[2020/22]
Former [2016/52]For all designated states
Syntarga B.V.
Toernooiveld 1
6525 ED Nijmegen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BEUSKER, Patrick Henry
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
02 / COUMANS, Rudy Gerardus Elisabeth
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
03 / ELGERSMA, Ronald Christiaan
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
04 / MENGE, Wiro Michael Petrus Bernardus
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
05 / JOOSTEN, Johannes Albertus Frederikus
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
06 / SPIJKER, Henri Johannes
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
07 / GROOT de, Franciscus Marinus Hendrikus
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)van der Sterren-Mol, Josephine
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
P.O. Box 7071
6503 GN Nijmegen / NL
[2020/25]
Former [2016/52]van der Sterren-Mol, Josephine
Synthon BV IP Research P.O. Box 7071
6503 GN Nijmegen / NL
Application number, filing date16176625.821.04.2011
[2016/52]
Priority number, dateUS20100326437P21.04.2010         Original published format: US 326437 P
US20100421824P10.12.2010         Original published format: US 421824 P
[2016/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3108886
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3108886
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3108886
Date:17.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/437, A61P35/00, A61K47/68, C07D471/04
[2019/40]
CPC:
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,RU,US); C07D471/04 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K38/385 (EP,US);
A61K39/44 (US); A61K47/545 (EP,US); A61K47/546 (KR);
A61K47/56 (KR); A61K47/60 (EP,US); A61K47/64 (US);
A61K47/643 (EP,US); A61K47/646 (US); A61K47/65 (EP,US);
A61K47/6803 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K47/6851 (US); A61P35/00 (EP,RU);
A61P35/04 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2017/13]A61K31/437, A61P35/00, A61K47/50, C07D471/04
Former IPC [2016/52]A61K31/437, A61P35/00, A61K47/48, C07D471/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/44]
Former [2016/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KONJUGATE VON CC-1065 ANALOGEN UND BIFUNKTIONELLE LINKER[2016/52]
English:CONJUGATES OF CC-1065 ANALOGS AND BIFUNCTIONAL LINKERS[2016/52]
French:CONJUGUÉS D'ANALOGUES DU CC-1065 ET LIEURS BIFONCTIONNELS[2016/52]
Examination procedure28.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/44]
18.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2020Fee for grant paid
28.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11720340.6  / EP2560645
Opposition(s)18.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
25.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
30.04.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
MK17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
[2024/22]
Former [2021/50]AL17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
Former [2021/24]AL17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
Former [2021/09]AL17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
Former [2021/04]AL17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
Former [2020/51]LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9744000  (PANORAMA RES INC [US]);
 [X]WO9811101  (CANCER SOC AUCKLAND DIV NZ INC [NZ], et al);
 [X]WO03097635  (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al);
 [X]WO2004069201  (MEDLOGICS DEVICE CORP [US], et al);
 [X]WO2004101767  (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2010062171  (SYNTARGA BV [NL], et al);
by applicantEP0154445
 WO8804659
 WO9002746
 WO9116324
 WO9404535
 WO9531971
 US5475092
 US5585499
 WO9707097
 WO9712862
 US5646298
 WO9732850
 WO9744000
 WO9745411
 WO9811101
 US5739350
 WO9825898
 WO9852925
 US5843937
 US5846545
 WO9919298
 WO0183482
 WO0183448
 WO0230894
 WO02059122
 WO02067937
 WO02067930
 WO02068412
 WO02083180
 WO03022806
 WO03086318
 WO2004043493
 WO2004101767
 WO2005079398
 WO2005103040
 WO2005105154
 WO2005112919
 WO2006002895
 WO2006012527
 WO2006043839
 WO2006110476
 WO2007018431
 WO2007038658
 WO2007051081
 WO2007059404
 WO2007089149
 WO2008083312
 WO2008103693
 WO2009017394
 WO2009026274
 WO2009064908
 WO2009073533
 WO2009073524
 WO2009073546
 US2009162372
 WO2009134977
 WO2010062171
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.