blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3150227

EP3150227 - INORGANIC NANOPARTICLES OF HIGH DENSITY TO DESTROY CELLS IN-VIVO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nanobiotix
60 rue de Wattignies
75012 Paris / FR
[2017/14]
Inventor(s)01 / LEVY, Laurent
246 boulevard Raspail
75014 Paris / FR
02 / POTTIER, Agnès
6 rue Sainte Beuve
75006 Paris / FR
03 / ROUET, Annabelle
6 avenue Arnold Netter
75012 Paris / FR
04 / MARILL, Julie
8 rue des Pontons
94140 Alfortville / FR
05 / DEVAUX, Corinne
2 Square Lulli Résidence du Parc Saint Cyr
78330 Fontenay-le-Fleury / FR
06 / GERMAIN, Matthieu
6 rue de la Fontaine
77163 Dammartin sur Tigeaux / FR
 [2018/37]
Former [2017/14]01 / LEVY, Laurent
246 boulevard Raspail
75014 Paris / FR
02 / POTTIER, Agnès
6 rue Sainte Beuve
75006 PARIS / FR
03 / ROUET, Annabelle
6 avenue Arnold Netter
75012 PARIS / FR
04 / MARILL, Julie
8 rue des Pontons
94140 ALFORTVILLE / FR
05 / DEVAUX, Corinne
2 Square Lulli Résidence du Parc Saint Cyr
78330 FONTENAY LE FLEURY / FR
06 / GERMAIN, Matthieu
3 avenue Marx Dormoy
94500 CHAMPIGNY SUR MARNE / FR
Representative(s)Cabinet Becker et Associés
25, rue Louis le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[2017/14]
Application number, filing date16187263.504.06.2009
[2017/14]
Priority number, dateEP2008015768605.06.2008         Original published format: EP 08157686
US20080060202P10.06.2008         Original published format: US 60202 P
[2017/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3150227
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3150227
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K41/00, A61P35/00, B82Y5/00, // A61K33/24
[2018/03]
CPC:
A61K41/0038 (EP,KR,US); A61K33/244 (KR); A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K9/14 (KR); A61P35/00 (EP,KR); B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
Y10S977/904 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/14]A61K41/00, A61P35/00, B82Y5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/43]
Former [2017/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ANORGANISCHE NANOPARTIKEL, HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2017/14]
English:INORGANIC NANOPARTICLES OF HIGH DENSITY TO DESTROY CELLS IN-VIVO[2017/14]
French:NANOPARTICULES INORGANIQUES, LEUR PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATIONS[2017/14]
Examination procedure05.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
22.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2018Fee for grant paid
17.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09757595.5  / EP2300054
Divisional application(s)EP18203014.8  / EP3461502
Opposition(s)01.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
05.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
05.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
05.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2005120590  (NANOBIOTIX [FR], et al) [AD] 1-22 * page 4, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 8, paragraph LAST - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 1 - page 16, paragraph 3 * * page 16, paragraph LAST - page 17, paragraph 1 * * examples 1,4,5 *;
 [I]WO2008007290  (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [I] 1-4,7-13,17-22 * page 1, lines 6-7 * * page 4, lines 24-27 * * page 5, lines 20-22 * * page 6, lines 4-15 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 2 * * claim 5 *;
 [IA]WO2008059419  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-14,17-22 * page 1, lines 2,3 * * page 4, lines 18-26 * * page 9, line 7 - page 10, line 15 * * claim 4 * [A] 15,16;
 [A]  - SMITH BRIAN W ET AL, "Rhenium oxide nanoparticles for the targeted radiotherapy of solid tumors.", ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, & MEETING OF THE DIVISION OF CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY OF THE AMERICAN-CHEMICAL-SOCIETY HELD AT THE 228TH N; PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA; AUGUST 22 -26, 2004, (200408), vol. 228, no. Part 2, ISSN 0065-7727, page U6, XP008096435 [A] 1-22 * abstract *
 [A]  - WEBB P.A., "Volume and Density Determinations for Particle Technologists", (200102), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://www.micromeritics.com/pdf/app_articles/density_determinations.pdf, (20080915), XP002495931 [A] 1-22 * pages 8-9, scetion "Skeletal Volume and Density by Gas Pycnometry" *
by applicantUS6955639
 WO2005120590
 US2007274909
    - J A REDDY; C ABBURI; H HOFLAND; S J HOWARD; I VLAHOV; P WILS; C P LEAMON, "Folate-targeted, cationic liposome-mediated gene transfer into disseminated peritoneal tumors", GENE THERAPY, (2002), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.gt.3301833, pages 1542 - 1550, XP055364985

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301833
    - KETAN B.; GHAGHADAA,B; JUSTIN SAULD,E; AYAGANESH V.; NATARAJANB,C; RAVI V.; BELLAMKONDAD,E; ANANTH V.; ANNAPRAGADAA,B,T., "Folate targeting of drug carriers: A mathematical model", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2005), vol. 104, pages 113 - 128
    - ZHOU, CHEM MATER, (2003), vol. 15, pages 378 - 382
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.