blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3178490

EP3178490 - RSV F PROTEIN COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.03.2022
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.11.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2025New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut, 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2017/24]
Inventor(s)01 / SWANSON, Kurt
c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
IP Services M/S X-100B
P.O. Box 8097
Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US
02 / DORMITZER, Philip, R.
c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
IP Services M/S X-100B
P.O. Box 8097
Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US
 [2017/24]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/24]Thornley, Rachel Mary, et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date16190004.815.07.2010
[2017/24]
Priority number, dateUS20090225805P15.07.2009         Original published format: US 225805 P
US20100294426P12.01.2010         Original published format: US 294426 P
[2017/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3178490
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3178490
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3178490
Date:20.04.2022
Language:EN
[2022/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/155, C07K14/135, C07K16/10
[2017/24]
CPC:
C07K16/1027 (EP,US); A61K39/12 (EP,US); A61K39/155 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP); A61P31/14 (EP); A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US); A61K2039/5252 (EP,US); A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US); A61K2039/53 (EP,US); A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US); A61K2039/55561 (EP,US); A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55572 (EP,US); A61K39/00 (EP,US); C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US); C07K2319/21 (EP,US); C07K2319/50 (EP,US);
C07K2319/73 (EP,US); C12N2760/18522 (EP,US); C12N2760/18534 (EP,US);
C12N2770/36143 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
TitleGerman:RSV-F-PROTEINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2017/24]
English:RSV F PROTEIN COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME[2017/24]
French:COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE PROTÉINE F DU VRS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS[2017/24]
Examination procedure21.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/24]
21.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.05.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2021Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2021Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2022Fee for grant paid
14.03.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10734875.7  / EP2453918
EP15200194.7
Divisional application(s)EP21199223.5  / EP3988115
EP22181400.7   Application withdrawn  : 24.11.2022
EP22181401.5   Application withdrawn  : 24.11.2022
EP22200670.2  / EP4183412
EP22214601.1  / EP4218799
EP22214608.6  / EP4218800
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.01.2023  20.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V.
Archimedesweg 4-6
2333 CN Leiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  20.01.2023  07.04.2025  WITHDRAWN
Pfizer Inc.
66 Hudson Boulevard East
New York, NY 10001-2192 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
 [2025/20]
Former [2023/26]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2023  20.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V.
Archimedesweg 4-6
2333 CN Leiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  20.01.2023  23.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
66 Hudson Boulevard East
New York, NY 10001-2192 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2023/10]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2023  20.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V.
Archimedesweg 4-6
2333 CN Leiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  20.01.2023  23.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2023/09]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2023  20.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V.
Archimedesweg 4-6
2333 CN Leiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  20.01.2023   
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
03.02.2023Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.08.2023Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.02.2026Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
26.05.2020Request for further processing filed
26.05.2020Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.06.2020Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.04.2019Request for further processing filed
17.04.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.05.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
10.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 11
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
MK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
GB27.03.2023
[2024/30]
Former [2024/22]AL20.04.2022
MK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
GB27.03.2023
Former [2023/47]AL20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
GB27.03.2023
Former [2023/17]AL20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
Former [2023/10]SM20.04.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03083095  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al);
 [XYA]WO2009079796  (ID BIOMEDICAL CORP QUEBEC [CA], et al);
 [PA]WO2010009277  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al);
 [PI]WO2010077717  (NOVAVAX INC [US], et al);
by applicantUS4186745
 EP0109942
 US4666886
 US4680338
 US4689338
 US4797368
 GB2220211
 US4929624
 WO9014837
 US4988815
 US5011828
 WO9106309
 US5057540
 WO9215582
 US5173414
 US5238944
 WO9319780
 US5266575
 US5268376
 WO9324640
 WO9324641
 WO9400153
 US5279833
 US5340740
 US5346905
 WO9421292
 US5352784
 EP0626169
 US5389640
 US5395937
 US5397307
 WO9511700
 WO9517211
 WO9517210
 US5482936
 US5494916
 WO9611711
 US5525612
 US5547472
 WO9626741
 WO9633739
 US5656479
 US5658731
 US5674192
 WO9840100
 WO9842375
 US5830510
 WO9927960
 US5916588
 US5936076
 WO9952549
 WO9962923
 WO0007621
 WO0023105
 US6060308
 US6071890
 US6080725
 US6083741
 US6083505
 US6090619
 US6090406
 US6114168
 US6129705
 US6207646
 WO0121207
 WO0121152
 WO0122972
 US6239116
 WO0195935
 WO0218383
 US6355271
 WO0226757
 US6429199
 US6440992
 EP0787180
 US6500668
 WO03011223
 WO03035836
 WO03043415
 US6586409
 US6605617
 WO03076601
 US6627640
 WO03082272
 US6664264
 US6664265
 US6667312
 WO03105769
 US6677347
 US6677348
 US6677349
 US6683088
 WO2004018455
 US6703402
 US6743920
 WO2004060308
 WO2004064715
 WO2004064759
 US6800624
 WO2004087153
 US6809203
 FR2859633
 US2005070556
 US6888000
 WO2005042728
 US6924293
 US6924271
 US2005192248
 US2005215517
 WO2005097181
 WO2005102049
 WO2006002422
 WO2006011060
 US2008057080
 US2008085870
 WO2009111337
 WO2009132206
 WO1994US05700
 EP20030291813
OppositionWO2009079796
 WO2009128951
 WO2011008974
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.