blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3178849

EP3178849 - COMBINATION OF ANTI-LAG-3 ANTIBODIES AND ANTI-PD-1 ANTIBODIES TO TREAT TUMORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2024Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL
published on 06.11.2024  [2024/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
[2017/24]
Inventor(s)01 / KORMAN, Alan J.
700 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
02 / LONBERG, Nils
700 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
03 / FONTANA, David J.
1201 Eastlake Avenue E.
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
04 / GUTIERREZ, Andres A.
Route 206&Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
05 / SELBY, Mark J.
700 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
06 / LEWIS, Katherine E.
1201 Eastlake Avenue E.
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
 [2017/24]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstraße 4
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/24]Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date16197459.718.09.2014
[2017/24]
Priority number, dateUS201361880606P20.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361880606 P
US201462014471P19.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462014471 P
[2017/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3178849
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3178849
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/28
[2018/35]
CPC:
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,US); A61K2039/54 (IL,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/21 (IL,US); C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/53 (IL,US); C07K2317/56 (IL,US); C07K2317/565 (IL,US);
C07K2317/73 (IL,KR); C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/94 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/24]C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
Former [2017/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION AUS ANTI-LAG-3-ANTIKÖRPERN UND ANTI-PD-1-ANTIKÖRPERN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TUMOREN[2017/24]
English:COMBINATION OF ANTI-LAG-3 ANTIBODIES AND ANTI-PD-1 ANTIBODIES TO TREAT TUMORS[2017/24]
French:COMBINAISON D'ANTICORPS ANTI-LAG-3 ET D'ANTICORPS ANTI-PD-1 POUR TRAITER DES TUMEURS[2017/24]
Examination procedure07.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
06.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.02.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
07.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14786389.8  / EP3046939
Divisional application(s)EP18209399.7  / EP3508502
EP23167891.3  / EP4249065
Opposition(s)02.01.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2024/45]
Former [2022/31]AL20.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2010019570  (MEDAREX INC [US], et al);
 [T]WO2014008218  (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]);
 [E]WO2015016718  (BIONOVION HOLDING B V [NL]);
by applicantWO2006121168
 US7943743
 US2011150892
 US8008449
 WO2013US40764
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.