blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3170818

EP3170818 - SOLID FORMS OF 3-(6-(1-(2,2-DIFLUOROBENZO[D][1,3]DIOXOL-5-YL) CYCLOPROPANECARBOXAMIDO)-3-METHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL) BENZOIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.01.2021  [2021/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
50 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210 / US
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / KESHAVARZ-SHOKRI, Ali
4285 Corte Langostino
San Diego, California 92130 / US
02 / ZHANG, Beili
4505 Shorepointe Way
San Diego, California 92130 / US
03 / KRAWIEC, Mariusz
46 Littlefield Lane
Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US
 [2020/08]
Former [2017/21]01 / KESHAVARZ-SHOKRI, Ali
4285 Corte Langostino
San Diego, CA California 92130 / US
02 / ZHANG, Beili
4505 Shorepointe Way
San Diego, CA California 92130 / US
03 / KRAWIEC, Mariusz
46 Littlefield Lane
Marlborough, MA Massachusetts 01752 / US
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2017/21]
Application number, filing date16198922.304.12.2008
[2017/21]
Priority number, dateUS20070012162P07.12.2007         Original published format: US 12162 P
[2017/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3170818
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3170818
Date:19.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2017
ClassificationIPC:C07D405/12, A61P11/00, A61K31/4709
[2018/42]
CPC:
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K31/443 (KR); A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP); A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP); A61P19/08 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP); A61P27/04 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP); A61P3/10 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP); A61P5/50 (EP); A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP); C07D405/08 (KR);
C07B2200/13 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/21]C07D405/12, A61K31/443, A61P11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/01]
Former [2017/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL24.11.2017
BA24.11.2017
RS24.11.2017
TitleGerman:FESTE FORMEN VON 3-(6-(1-(2,2-DIFLUORBENZO[D][1,3]DIOXOL-5-YL)-CYCLOPROPANCARBOXAMIDO)-3-METHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL)BENZOESÄURE[2017/21]
English:SOLID FORMS OF 3-(6-(1-(2,2-DIFLUOROBENZO[D][1,3]DIOXOL-5-YL) CYCLOPROPANECARBOXAMIDO)-3-METHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL) BENZOIC ACID[2017/21]
French:FORMES SOLIDES D'ACIDE BENZOÏQUE 3-(6- (1- (2,2-DIFLUOROBENZO [D] [1,3] DIOXOL-5-YL) CYCLOPROPANECARBOXAMIDO) -3-METHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL)[2017/21]
Examination procedure15.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
02.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2020Fee for grant paid
07.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08855812.7  / EP2225230
Divisional application(s)EP20157902.6  / EP3683218
Opposition(s)20.11.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2007056341  (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al)
by applicantUS5304121
 US5886026
 US6099562
 WO2004028480
 WO2004080972
 WO2004091502
 WO2004110352
 WO2004111014
 WO2005035514
 WO2005049018
 US2005164973
 WO2005094374
 WO2005120497
 WO2006002421
 US6992096
 US2006035943
 WO2006044456
 WO2006044682
 WO2006044505
 WO2006044503
 WO2006044502
 US2006148864
 US2006148863
 WO2006099256
 WO2006101740
 WO2006110483
 WO2006127588
 US7202262
 WO2007044560
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.