EP3173694 - DEVICE FOR COMBINED DELIVERY OF HEAT AND LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HL Innovation GmbH Planseestraße 4 6600 Reutte / AT | [2017/31] |
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states Hackl, Thomas Kreckelmoosstraße 4a 6600 Breitenwang / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackl, Thomas Kreckelmoosstraße 4a 6600 Breitenwang / AT | [2017/31] |
Former [2017/22] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 16200528.4 | 24.11.2016 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | AT20150051021 | 30.11.2015 Original published format: AT 510212015 | AT20160050673 | 22.07.2016 Original published format: AT 506732016 | [2017/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173694 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3173694 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21V33/00, F21S8/00, F21S8/04, F24D13/02, F21V8/00, // F21Y115/10 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
F21S8/03 (EP);
F21S8/04 (EP,AT);
F21V33/00 (EP,AT);
F24D13/022 (AT);
F24D13/024 (EP);
G02B6/0036 (EP);
G02B6/0068 (EP);
F21Y2101/00 (AT);
F21Y2115/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE KOMBINIERTE ABGABE VON WÄRMESTRAHLUNG UND LICHT | [2017/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR COMBINED DELIVERY OF HEAT AND LIGHT | [2017/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION COMBINÉE DE RAYONNEMENT THERMIQUE ET DE LUMIÈRE | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 15.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2016 | AL | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | MT | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | LU | 24.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 06.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2412521 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,10,12 * figure 2 * * claims 1-8 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 15] - [0021] - [0 25] , [0 26] * [Y] 3,5-7,9,11 [I] 3,8,11,13; | [XI]DE202013103223U (CZARNOTTA ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] * [I] 3-5; | [Y]CN203099772U (CHEN WEIDA) [Y] 5-7 * figure 2 * * example 1 *; | [IY]DE202014100735U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [I] 4,10,12 * figure 1A * * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] - [0 54] - [0061] * [Y] 3,9,11; | [A]GB2361990 (JK MICROTECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * examples 1, 2, 4-6 * | Examination | JP2005337697 |