EP3283097 - FSH FOR TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/08] | COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY | ||
[2019/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferring B.V. Polaris Avenue 144 2132 JX Hoofddorp / NL | [2019/39] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Ferring BV Polaris Avenue 144 2132 JX Hoofddorp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCE SAEZ, Joan-Carles Ferring Pharmaceuticals A/S Kay Fiskars Plads 11 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | 02 /
HELMGAARD, Lisbeth Ferring Pharmaceuticals A/S Kay Fiskars Plads 11 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | 03 /
KLEIN, Bjarke Mirner Ferring Pharmaceuticals A/S Kay Fiskars Plads 11 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | [2020/27] |
Former [2018/08] | 01 /
ARCE SAEZ, Joan Carlos Ferring Pharmaceuticals A/S Kay Fiskars Plads 11 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | ||
02 /
HELMGAARD, Lisbeth Ferring Pharmaceuticals A/S Kay Fiskars Plads 11 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | |||
03 /
KLEIN, Bjarke Mirner Ferring Pharmaceuticals A/S Kay Fiskars Plads 11 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16719315.0 | 15.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016EP58358 | Priority number, date | EP20150164043 | 17.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15164043 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016166288 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283097 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3283097 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/24, A61P5/24 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
A61K38/24 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61P15/08 (KR);
A61P5/06 (KR,US);
A61P5/24 (EP,KR,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | 25.07.2017 | ME | 25.07.2017 | Validation states | MA | 25.07.2017 | MD | 25.07.2017 | Title | German: | FSH ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON UNFRUCHTBARKEIT | [2019/35] | English: | FSH FOR TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY | [2019/35] | French: | FSH POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFERTILITÉ | [2019/35] |
Former [2018/08] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON UNFRUCHTBARKEIT | ||
Former [2018/08] | COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY | ||
Former [2018/08] | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFERTILITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 20.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20150379.4 / EP3662925 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | LU | 15.04.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | CY | 12.02.2020 | |
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | EE | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | EE | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2013020996 (FERRING BV [NL], et al); | by applicant | WO2009127826 |