EP3319635 - A CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR AND A WHOLE CELL MYCOBACTERIUM FOR USE IN CANCER THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immodulon Therapeutics Limited 6-9 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1FW / GB | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKLE, Charles Immodulon Therapeutics Limited 6-9 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1FW / GB | 02 /
BRUNET, Laura Rosa Immodulon Therapeutics Limited 6-9 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1FW / GB | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16734013.2 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016GB51893 | Priority number, date | GB20150011120 | 24.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201511120 | GB20150011121 | 24.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201511121 | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016207646 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319635 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3319635 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61K35/74, A61P35/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (IL,KR);
A61K39/39558 (IL,US);
A61K39/395 (IL,RU);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/521 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/54 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/585 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHECKPOINT-INHIBITOR UND GANZZELLIGES MYCOBAKTERIUM ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER KREBSTHERAPIE | [2018/20] | English: | A CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR AND A WHOLE CELL MYCOBACTERIUM FOR USE IN CANCER THERAPY | [2018/20] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE POINT DE VÉRIFICATION ET MYCOBACTÉRIE À GERMES ENTIERS DESTINÉS À UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCER | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2018/20] | 23.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21167914.7 / EP3868406 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2016 | AL | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | LU | 24.06.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.06.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.06.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007050405 (MED COLLEGE GEORGIA RES INST [US], et al); | [I]US2013209517 (AKLE CHARLES [GB], et al); | [I]WO2014181121 (IMMODULON THERAPEUTICS [GB]); | [XPI]WO2015092382 (IMMODULON THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]); | by applicant | WO2006101692 | WO2010027827 | US7799776 | WO2011066342 | US8004449 | US8217149 | WO2012135408 | US2012294796 | US8809562 | US8962804 | US8968388 | WO2015042246 |