EP3242931 - FORMULATIONS FOR STABILIZING BACTERIAL CELL EXTRACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/46] | FORMULATIONS FOR DRYING BACTERIAL CELL EXTRACTS | ||
[2020/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.01.2025 [2025/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sutro Biopharma, Inc. 310 Utah Avenue, Suite 150 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2021/27] |
Former [2017/46] | For all designated states Sutro Biopharma, Inc. 310 Utah Street, Suite 150 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDLER, Martin 310 Utah Avenue, Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
HAYENGA, Kirk 310 Utah Avenue, Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
HEINSOHN, Henry 310 Utah Avenue, Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2021/27] |
Former [2021/13] | 01 /
CHANDLER, Martin 310 Utah Street, Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
02 /
HAYENGA, Kirk 310 Utah Street, Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
03 /
HEINSOHN, Henry 310 Utah Street, Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
Former [2017/46] | 01 /
CHANDLER, Martin 310 Utah Street Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
02 /
HAYENGA, Kirk 310 Utah Street Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
03 /
HEINSOHN, Henry 310 Utah Street Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Representative(s) | Geling, Andrea ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2017/46] | Application number, filing date | 16735454.7 | 08.01.2016 | [2017/46] | WO2016US12599 | Priority number, date | US201562101266P | 08.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562101266 P | [2017/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016112258 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242931 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3242931 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12P1/04, C12P21/02, C12P21/04, C12N1/04, C07K14/535, C07K16/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C12P21/00 (US);
C07K14/535 (US);
C07K16/00 (US);
C12P1/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/46] | C12N1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON BAKTERIENZELLENEXTRAKTEN | [2020/44] | English: | FORMULATIONS FOR STABILIZING BACTERIAL CELL EXTRACTS | [2020/44] | French: | FORMULATIONS POUR LA STABILISATION D'EXTRAITS DE CELLULES BACTÉRIENNES | [2020/44] |
Former [2017/46] | FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR TROCKNUNG VON BAKTERIENZELLENEXTRAKTEN | ||
Former [2017/46] | FORMULATIONS FOR DRYING BACTERIAL CELL EXTRACTS | ||
Former [2017/46] | FORMULATIONS POUR LA LYOPHILISATION D'EXTRAITS DE CELLULES BACTÉRIENNES | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 02.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2016 | AL | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | MT | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | TR | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2025/04] |
Former [2024/42] | HU | 08.01.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
MT | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
TR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.01.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
TR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.01.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.01.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.01.2016 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 31.03.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0259739 (MILES LAB [US]); | [A]US2012230976 (HELMERHORST EVA J [US], et al); | [Y]WO2014004639 (SUTRO BIOPHARMA INC [US]); | Examination | US7048915 |