blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3317281

EP3317281 - SOLID FORMS AND FORMULATIONS OF (S)-4-(8-AMINO-3-(1-(BUT-2-YNOYL)PYRROLIDIN-2-YL)IMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-1-YL)-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)BENZAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/19]SOLID FORMS AND FORMULATIONS OF (S)-4-(8-AMINO-3-(1 -(BUT-2-YNOYL)PYRROLIDIN-2-YL)IMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-1-YL)-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)BENZAMIDE
[2019/36]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  07.02.2025
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.03.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2025Opposition rejectedpublished on 12.03.2025  [2025/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acerta Pharma B.V.
Kloosterstraat 9
5349 AB Oss / NL
[2018/19]
Inventor(s)01 / BLATTER, Fritz
Oerinstrasse 67
CH-4153 Reinach / CH
02 / INGALLINERA, Tim
987 Haight Street
Apt. 8
San Francisco, California 94117 / US
03 / BARF, Tjeerd
St. Luciastraat 7
5371 AS Ravenstein / NL
04 / ARET, Edwin
Stellingmolenstraat 109
1333 CJ Almere / NL
05 / KREJSA, Cecile
3222 Northwest 65th Street
Seattle, Washington 98117 / US
06 / EVARTS, Jerry
14491 NE 57th Street
Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US
 [2018/19]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/19]D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date16735945.401.07.2016
[2018/19]
WO2016IB53988
Priority number, dateUS201562188468P02.07.2015         Original published format: US 201562188468 P
US201562271708P28.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562271708 P
[2018/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017002095
Date:05.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3317281
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3317281
Date:22.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.01.2017
ClassificationIPC:C07D487/04, A61K31/4985, A61P35/00
[2018/19]
CPC:
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K31/4985 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K45/06 (IL,US);
A61K47/36 (IL,US); A61P1/04 (EP,IL); A61P13/08 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL); A61P17/00 (EP,IL); A61P17/04 (EP,IL);
A61P17/06 (EP,IL); A61P19/00 (EP,IL); A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P21/00 (EP,IL); A61P27/02 (EP,IL); A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL); A61P31/04 (EP,IL); A61P31/18 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL); A61P35/02 (EP,CN,IL); A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL); A61P9/10 (EP,IL); C07B2200/13 (CN,IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
Extension statesBA02.02.2018
ME02.02.2018
Validation statesMA02.02.2018
MD02.02.2018
TitleGerman:FESTE FORMEN UND FORMULIERUNGEN VON (S) -4-(8-AMINO-3-(1-(BUT-2-YNOYL ) PYRROLIDIN-2-YL) IMIDAZO [ 1,5-A ] PYRAZIN-1-YL ) -N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL) BENZAMID[2018/19]
English:SOLID FORMS AND FORMULATIONS OF (S)-4-(8-AMINO-3-(1-(BUT-2-YNOYL)PYRROLIDIN-2-YL)IMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-1-YL)-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)BENZAMIDE[2019/36]
French:FORMES SOLIDES ET FORMULATIONS DE (S)-4-(8-AMINO-3-(1-(BUT-2-YNOYL)PYRROLIDIN-2-YL)IMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-1-YL)-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)BENZAMIDE[2018/19]
Former [2018/19]SOLID FORMS AND FORMULATIONS OF (S)-4-(8-AMINO-3-(1 -(BUT-2-YNOYL)PYRROLIDIN-2-YL)IMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-1-YL)-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)BENZAMIDE
Entry into regional phase02.02.2018National basic fee paid 
02.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/19]
22.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2020Fee for grant paid
22.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19196939.3  / EP3613745
EP21182842.1  / EP3954690
EP23157244.7  / EP4209493
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.01.2021  25.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 [2024/08]
Former [2024/04]
Opponent(s)01  21.01.2021  25.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2021/09]
Opponent(s)01  21.01.2021  25.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstr. 2
80538 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstraße 2
80538 München / DE
05.02.2021Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.05.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.03.2022Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2022Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.2022Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
19.11.2024Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2025/11]
Appeal following opposition02.06.2022Appeal received No.  T1418/22
02.06.2022Payment of appeal fee
09.08.2022Statement of grounds filed
19.11.2024Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
16.01.2025Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
19.11.2024Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2024/31]
Former [2021/04]AL22.04.2020
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2013010868  (MSD OSS BV [NL], et al)
by applicantWO2013010868
 US2014155385
OppositionWO2013010868
 EP2734522
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.