EP3298140 - COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING PATHOLOGICAL CALCIFICATION CONDITIONS, AND METHODS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2025 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven CT 06510 / US | [2024/16] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADDOCK, Demetrios 240 Bluff View Drive Guilford, Connecticut 06437 / US | 02 /
ALBRIGHT, Ronald P.O. Box 185051 Hamden, Connecticut 06518 / US | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16797290.0 | 19.05.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016US33236 | Priority number, date | US201562163500P | 19.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562163500 P | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016187408 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3298140 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3298140 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, C12N9/96, C12N15/85, C12N15/63, C12N15/00, C12N15/52, A61P9/10, A61P13/12 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
A61K38/1741 (EP,RU,US);
C07K14/745 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A01K67/0271 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/02 (EP,US);
A61K38/04 (EP,US);
A61K38/46 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/465 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61P13/12 (EP,RU,US);
A61P9/10 (EP,RU,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
C12N15/52 (US);
C12N15/625 (EP,RU,US);
C12N15/85 (US);
C12N9/96 (EP,RU,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
C12Y301/04001 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C12Y306/01009 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A01K2207/15 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2207/20 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0387 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/01 (US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/31 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/33 (US);
C07K2319/70 (US);
C12N2840/007 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | C12N9/96, C12N15/85, C12N15/63, C12N15/00, C12N15/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG PATHOLOGISCHER CALCIFIZIERUNGSERKRANKUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/13] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING PATHOLOGICAL CALCIFICATION CONDITIONS, AND METHODS USING SAME | [2018/13] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS DE CALCIFICATION PATHOLOGIQUE, ET MÉTHODES LES UTILISANT | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 11.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24171629.9 / EP4414028 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2025 | No opposition filed within time limit [2025/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.04.2024 | BG | 24.04.2024 | CZ | 24.04.2024 | DK | 24.04.2024 | EE | 24.04.2024 | FI | 24.04.2024 | HR | 24.04.2024 | LV | 24.04.2024 | MC | 24.04.2024 | RO | 24.04.2024 | SI | 24.04.2024 | SK | 24.04.2024 | SM | 24.04.2024 | LU | 19.05.2024 | RS | 24.07.2024 | GR | 25.07.2024 | IS | 24.08.2024 | PT | 26.08.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2025/11] | AT | 24.04.2024 | |
BG | 24.04.2024 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2024 | ||
DK | 24.04.2024 | ||
EE | 24.04.2024 | ||
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
LV | 24.04.2024 | ||
MC | 24.04.2024 | ||
RO | 24.04.2024 | ||
SK | 24.04.2024 | ||
SM | 24.04.2024 | ||
LU | 19.05.2024 | ||
RS | 24.07.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
Former [2025/10] | AT | 24.04.2024 | |
BG | 24.04.2024 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2024 | ||
DK | 24.04.2024 | ||
EE | 24.04.2024 | ||
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
LV | 24.04.2024 | ||
RO | 24.04.2024 | ||
SK | 24.04.2024 | ||
SM | 24.04.2024 | ||
LU | 19.05.2024 | ||
RS | 24.07.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
Former [2025/09] | AT | 24.04.2024 | |
BG | 24.04.2024 | ||
DK | 24.04.2024 | ||
EE | 24.04.2024 | ||
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
LV | 24.04.2024 | ||
LU | 19.05.2024 | ||
RS | 24.07.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
Former [2025/08] | AT | 24.04.2024 | |
BG | 24.04.2024 | ||
DK | 24.04.2024 | ||
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
LV | 24.04.2024 | ||
LU | 19.05.2024 | ||
RS | 24.07.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | AT | 24.04.2024 | |
BG | 24.04.2024 | ||
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
LV | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.07.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | AT | 24.04.2024 | |
BG | 24.04.2024 | ||
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | BG | 24.04.2024 | |
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
Former [2024/46] | BG | 24.04.2024 | |
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2014126965 (UNIV YALE [US]); | International search | [A]US2007015145 (WOOLF CLIFFORD [US], et al); | [A]US2014377859 (QUINN ANTHONY [US], et al) | by applicant | US4160452 | US4256108 | US4265874 | EP0322094 | EP0330451 | EP0361991 | WO9011757 | EP0399666 | EP0413622 | US5007790 | US5169645 | WO9315199 | WO9315200 | WO9318755 | US5582837 | WO9747285 | WO9811879 | WO9855107 | US5972389 | US6156501 | WO0132217 | WO0156544 | WO0197783 | US6340475 | WO0232416 | US2002051820 | US6451808 | US6488962 | WO02096404 | US2003039688 | US2003044466 | WO03035041 | WO03035040 | WO03035029 | WO03035177 | WO03035039 | US2003104062 | US2003104053 | US2003147952 | WO2012125182 |