blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Geplante Wartungsarbeiten

Regelmäßige Unterbrechungen:
zwischen 5.00 und 5.15 Uhr MEZ (Montag bis Sonntag).

Andere Unterbrechungen
Verfügbarkeit

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

Kurzmeldungen

Lettland beteiligt sich am Vereinigten Register
Nähere Informationen zum Vereinigten Register finden Sie hier.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3337462

EP3337462 - MELATONIN-MINITABLETTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/26]MELATONIN-MINITABLETTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON
[2020/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.08.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.07.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.06.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2021No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.09.2021  [2021/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neurim Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
27 HaBarzel Street
6971039 Tel Aviv / IL
[2020/31]
Former [2018/26]For all designated states
NEURIM PHARMACEUTICALS (1991) LIMITED
27 HaBarzel Street
6971039 Tel Aviv / IL
Inventor(s)01 / LAUDON, Moshe
c/o Neurim Pharmaceuticals Ltd. 27
HaBarzel Street
6971039 Tel Aviv / IL
02 / ZISAPEL, Nava
c/o Neurim Pharmaceuticals Ltd. 27
HaBarzel Street
6971039 Tel Aviv / IL
 [2018/26]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[2018/26]
Application number, filing date16805903.829.11.2016
[2018/26]
WO2016IB57190
Priority number, dateUS201662415014P31.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662415014 P
[2018/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018078429
Date:03.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3337462
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3337462
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61P25/20, A61K31/4045
[2020/29]
CPC:
A61K31/4045 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K9/2072 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K9/0053 (KR);
A61K9/2009 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K9/2018 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K9/2027 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/28 (IL,KR); A61K9/4808 (IL,KR); A61P25/20 (EP,IL,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/26]A61K9/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MELATONIN-MINITABLETTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2020/29]
English:MELATONIN MINI-TABLETS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2018/26]
French:MINI-COMPRIMÉS DE MÉLATONINE ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2018/26]
Former [2018/26]MELATONIN-MINITABLETTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON
Entry into regional phase22.01.2018National basic fee paid 
22.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/26]
22.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.07.2020Fee for grant paid
16.07.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2020Information about intention to grant a patent
21.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20195788.3  / EP3777842
EP24208766.6
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0518468  (NEURIM PHARMA 1991 [IL]);
 [A]WO9503043  (OREGON STATE [US]);
 [Y]EP0724878  (NEURIM PHARMA 1991 [IL]);
 [Y]WO03086352  (NEURIM PHARMACEUTICALS LTD 1991 [IL], et al);
by applicantUS6469044
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.