EP3383845 - PREPARATION OF LATANOPROSTENE BUNOD OF DESIRED, PRE-DEFINED QUALITY BY GRAVITY CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROAPI Hungary Limited Liability Company To u. 1-5. 1045 Budapest / HU | [2022/14] |
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Tó utca 1-5 1045 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKÁCS, László c/o Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Iparjog Tó u. 1-5. Budapest 1045 / HU | 02 /
FEKETE, Ibolya c/o Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Iparjog Tó u. 1-5. Budapest 1045 / HU | 03 /
BUZDER-LANTOS, Péter c/o Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Iparjog Tó u. 1-5. Budapest 1045 / HU | 04 /
LÁSZLÓFI, István c/o Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Iparjog Tó u. 1-5. Budapest 1045 / HU | 05 /
HORTOBÁGYI, Irén c/o Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Iparjog Tó u. 1-5. Budapest 1045 / HU | 06 /
HAVASI, Gábor c/o Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Iparjog Tó u. 1-5. Budapest 1045 / HU | 07 /
KARDOS, Zsuzsanna c/o Chinoin Gyógyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára Zrt. Iparjog Tó u. 1-5. Budapest 1045 / HU | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Danubia Patent & Law Office LLC Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 16 1051 Budapest / HU | [2023/28] |
Former [2018/41] | Danubia Patent & Law Office LLC 16 Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 1051 Budapest / HU | Application number, filing date | 16822513.4 | 11.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016HU00071 | Priority number, date | HU20150000594 | 04.12.2015 Original published format: HU 1500594 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017093771 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3383845 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3383845 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C405/00 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
C07C405/00 (EP,HU,US);
B01D15/08 (RU);
C07C15/00 (KR);
B01D15/10 (HU);
C07C405/0041 (US);
A61K31/5575 (HU);
B01D15/42 (HU);
C07B63/00 (HU);
B01D15/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON LATANOPROSTENBUNOD IN DER GEWÜNSCHTEN, VORGEGEBENEN QUALITÄT DURCH SCHWERKRAFT-CHROMATOGRAFIE | [2018/41] | English: | PREPARATION OF LATANOPROSTENE BUNOD OF DESIRED, PRE-DEFINED QUALITY BY GRAVITY CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2018/41] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE LATANOPROSTÈNE BUNOD DE QUALITÉ PRÉDÉFINIE, SOUHAITÉE, PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE PAR GRAVITÉ | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 22.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | LU | 11.11.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/36] | EE | 12.07.2023 | |
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 11.11.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 12.07.2023 | |
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 11.11.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | EE | 12.07.2023 | |
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | EE | 12.07.2023 | |
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | LV | 12.07.2023 | |
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | LV | 12.07.2023 | |
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | IS | 12.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2005068421 (NICOX SA [FR], et al) |