EP3393730 - MODULAR EXOSKELETON STRUCTURE THAT PROVIDES FORCE ASSISTANCE TO THE USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | For all designated states B-Temia Inc. 2750 rue Einstein Bureau 230 Québec, Québec G1P 4R1 / CA | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRENIER, Jordane c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
BEDARD, Stéphane C/O B Temia INC. 2750 rue Einstein bureau 230 Québec Québec G1P4R1 / CA | 03 /
THIEFFRY, Roland c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 04 /
VAURE, Alexandre c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 05 /
BAPTISTA, Jonathan c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16825779.8 | 23.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016EP82597 | Priority number, date | FR20150063348 | 24.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1563348 | FR20150063350 | 24.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1563350 | [2018/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017109196 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393730 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393730 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00, B25J9/08, B25J19/00, A45F3/10 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
B25J9/0006 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A45F3/10 (EP,IL,KR);
A61H3/00 (US);
B25J19/005 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B25J9/0009 (KR);
B25J9/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61H2003/007 (US);
A61H2201/0107 (US);
A61H2201/1215 (US);
A61H2201/1616 (US);
A61H2201/1626 (US);
A61H2201/1638 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE EXOSKELETTSTRUKTUR MIT KRAFTUNTERSTÜTZUNG FÜR DEN BENUTZER | [2018/44] | English: | MODULAR EXOSKELETON STRUCTURE THAT PROVIDES FORCE ASSISTANCE TO THE USER | [2018/44] | French: | STRUCTURE MODULAIRE D'EXOSQUELETTE POUR L'ASSISTANCE A L'EFFORT D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 24.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2016 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.12.2016 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.12.2016 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 12.02.2020 | |
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US7628766 (KAZEROONI HOMAYOON [US], et al) [A] 1,6-9 * column 7, lines 23-44 * * column 9, lines 33-50 ** figures 1,3,14 *; | [A]US2010049102 (YASUHARA KEN [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0036] , [0087] * * figure 6 *; | [A]US2015001269 (SACKSTEDER ANTHONY D [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0035] * * figures 5B,6 *; | [A]WO2015153633 (PARKER HANNIFIN CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 14, lines 3-20 * * page 18, lines 8-27 * * figure 1 * |