blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3397273

EP3397273 - AUGMENTED ACID ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE FOR THE TREATMENT OF POMPE DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2022
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.04.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.02.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2022No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.04.2022  [2022/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.
3675 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US
[2021/14]
Former [2018/45]For all designated states
Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.
1 Cedar Brook Drive
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DO, Hung V.
1 Cedarbrook Drive
Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US
02 / KHANNA, Richie
1 Cedar Brook Drive
Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US
03 / GOTSCHALL, Russell
1 Cedar Brook Drive
Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
[2018/45]
Application number, filing date16826898.529.12.2016
[2018/45]
WO2016US69243
Priority number, dateUS201562272890P30.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562272890 P
US201662300479P26.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662300479 P
US201662315412P30.03.2016         Original published format: US 201662315412 P
US201662402454P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662402454 P
US201662428867P01.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662428867 P
US201662431791P08.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662431791 P
[2018/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017117407
Date:06.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3397273
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3397273
Date:19.05.2021
Language:EN
[2021/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/47, A61K31/445
[2018/45]
CPC:
A61K38/47 (EP,US); A61K31/05 (EP); A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP); C12Y302/0102 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
Extension statesBA30.07.2018
ME30.07.2018
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUGMENTIERTE ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS POMPE[2018/45]
English:AUGMENTED ACID ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE FOR THE TREATMENT OF POMPE DISEASE[2018/45]
French:ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE ACIDE AMÉLIORÉE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE DE POMPE[2018/45]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2018National basic fee paid 
30.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
30.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2021Fee for grant paid
12.04.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP21174249.9  / EP3957320
EP23188938.7
Opposition(s)22.02.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2016054231  (AMICUS THERAPEUTICS INC [US]);
by applicantWO2004069190
 WO2006125141
 WO2013166249
 US8592362
 WO2014014938
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.