EP3377103 - FUNCTIONAL ANTIBODY FRAGMENT COMPLEMENTATION FOR A TWO-COMPONENTS SYSTEM FOR REDIRECTED KILLING OF UNWANTED CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.02.2025 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2025 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.03.2025 [2025/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revitope Limited Angel Building 407 St. John Street London EC1V 4AD / GB | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COBBOLD, Mark 1 Everett Avenue Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2025/11] |
Former [2021/11] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2018/39] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16867215.2 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US62748 | Priority number, date | US201562257552P | 19.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257552 P | US201562270907P | 22.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562270907 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087789 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377103 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3377103 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3377103 | Date: | 12.03.2025 | Language: | EN | [2025/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07K14/47, C07K16/26, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/04, A61P43/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
C07K16/2809 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/39558 (CN,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN);
A61P37/04 (EP,CN);
A61P43/00 (EP,CN);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/303 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/49] | A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07K14/47, C07K16/26, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K38/00, A61K39/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/39] | A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07K14/47, C07K16/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | KOMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES FUNKTIONELLEN ANTIKÖRPERFRAGMENTS FÜR EIN ZWEI-KOMPONENTEN-SYSTEM ZUR UMGELENKTEN TÖTUNG UNERWÜNSCHTER ZELLEN | [2018/39] | English: | FUNCTIONAL ANTIBODY FRAGMENT COMPLEMENTATION FOR A TWO-COMPONENTS SYSTEM FOR REDIRECTED KILLING OF UNWANTED CELLS | [2018/39] | French: | COMPLÉMENTATION DE FRAGMENT D'ANTICORPS FONCTIONNEL POUR UN SYSTÈME À DEUX COMPOSANTS POUR LA DESTRUCTION REDIRIGÉE DE CELLULES INDÉSIRABLES | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 25.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21150773.6 / EP3903818 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2021
12.06.2024
WITHDRAWN Cherry Biolabs GmbH Mauritiusplatz 7 97286 Winterhausen / DE Opponent's representative Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
17.12.2021
16.04.2024
WITHDRAWN Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8645 / JP Opponent's representative Dolphin, Kirsty Mairi, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2021
20.12.2021
ADMISSIBLE Cherry Biolabs GmbH Mauritiusplatz 7 97286 Winterhausen / DE Opponent's representative Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.12.2021
16.04.2024
WITHDRAWN Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8645 / JP Opponent's representative Dolphin, Kirsty Mairi, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | |||
Former [2022/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2021
20.12.2021
ADMISSIBLE Cherry Biolabs GmbH Mauritiusplatz 7 97286 Winterhausen / DE Opponent's representative Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.12.2021
11.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8645 / JP Opponent's representative Simpson, Kirsty Mairi Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | |||
Former [2022/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2021
20.12.2021
ADMISSIBLE Cherry Biolabs GmbH Mauritiusplatz 7 97286 Winterhausen / DE Opponent's representative Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 18.01.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.05.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.02.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | MT | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | EE | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | HR | 17.03.2021 | |
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 17.03.2021 | |
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 17.03.2021 | |
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 17.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012123755 (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB], et al); | [A]WO2014140358 (AMGEN RES MUNICH GMBH [DE]); | [XIY]WO2015013671 (CYTOMX THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2009130106 (CHRISTOPHERSON RICHARD IAN [AU], et al); | [XY]WO2015001361 (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB]); | [A]US2015079093 (STUHLER GERNOT [DE]); | [A]US2015183875 (COBBOLD MARK [GB], et al); | [Y]US2015307564 (YOUNG TRAVIS [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2007062466 | WO2013104804 | WO2015013671 | US2015183875 | Opposition | WO2007073499 | WO2012123755 | US2013060010 | WO2013104804 | WO2013128194 | WO2015013671 | US2015183875 | WO2017087789 | US2002076406 | US2008145362 | WO2010081173 | US2011229476 | WO2012158818 | US2014099254 | WO2017156178 |