blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3389699

EP3389699 - CHIMERIC AND HUMANIZED ANTI-HUMAN CTLA4 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2025
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2025No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2025  [2025/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OncoC4, Inc.
9640 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
[2024/18]
Former [2021/49]For all designated states
OncoC4, Inc.
9640 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
Former [2018/43]For all designated states
Oncoimmune, Inc.
9430 Key West Avenue
Suite 113
Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Yang
502 E Street NE
Washington, District of Columbia 20002 / US
02 / ZHENG, Pan
502 E Street NE
Washington, District of Columbia 20002 / US
03 / DEVENPORT, Martin
614 Still Creek Lane
Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2024/18]
Former [2018/43]Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
Application number, filing date16876612.914.12.2016
[2018/43]
WO2016US66698
Priority number, dateUS201562267735P15.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562267735 P
US201662309169P16.03.2016         Original published format: US 201662309169 P
US201662359036P06.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662359036 P
[2018/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017106372
Date:22.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3389699
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3389699
Date:01.05.2024
Language:EN
[2024/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2019
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00
[2024/01]
CPC:
C07K16/2818 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K39/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/575 (IL,US); C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/56 (CN,IL); C07K2317/565 (CN,IL);
C07K2317/72 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/732 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/94 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/43]A61K39/00, A61K39/395, C12P21/08, C07K16/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
Extension statesBA26.06.2018
ME26.06.2018
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIMÄRE UND HUMANISIERTE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN HUMANES CTLA4 UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2018/43]
English:CHIMERIC AND HUMANIZED ANTI-HUMAN CTLA4 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF[2018/43]
French:ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX CHIMÉRIQUES ET HUMANISÉS ANTI-CTLA4 HUMAINE, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2018/43]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2018National basic fee paid 
26.06.2018Search fee paid 
26.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
26.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2024Fee for grant paid
22.03.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP24164173.7  / EP4374926
Opposition(s)04.02.2025No opposition filed within time limit [2025/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.05.2024
[2025/10]
Documents cited:Search[I]CN101628940  (INST OF BIOLOGY AND PHYSICS CH);
 [I]WO2012120125  (ANTITOPE LTD [GB], et al);
 [A]US2013136749  (KORMAN ALAN J [US], et al);
 [A]WO2014089113  (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]);
International search[A]US2006228299  (THORPE PHILIP E [US], et al);
 [X]CN101628940  (INST OF BIOLOGY AND PHYSICS CH);
 [A]US7923221  (CABILLY SHMUEL [US], et al);
 [A]US2013136749  (KORMAN ALAN J [US], et al)
by applicantEP0239400
 WO9109967
 EP0519596
 US5225539
 EP0592106
 US5530101
 US5565332
 US5585089
 WO0114557
 WO0139722
 WO02086083
 US6803192
 US6808710
 US2005059051
 US7101550
 US2007202100
 US2008311117
 US7488802
 US2009055944
 US2009110667
 US2009274666
 US2009313687
 US7635757
 CN101628940
 US7722868
 US7794710
 WO2012120125
 US2013136749
 WO2014089113
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.