blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3409672

EP3409672 - PARAZOLE CONDENSED-RING DERIVATIVES AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN TREATMENT OF CANCERS, INFLAMMATION AND IMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2022
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.11.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.06.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2022No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.11.2022  [2022/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing InnoCare Pharma Tech Co., Ltd.
Building 8 No.8 Life Park Road
ZGC Life Science Park
Changping District
Beijing 102206 / CN
[2018/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Xiangyang
Bldg.8 No.8 Life Park Rd.
ZGC Life Science Park
Changping Dist.
Beijing 102206 / CN
02 / PANG, Yucheng
Bldg.8 No.8 Life Park Rd.
ZGC Life Science Park
Changping Dist.
Beijing 102206 / CN
 [2018/49]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V.
Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[2021/49]
Former [2018/49]Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date16887788.428.12.2016
[2018/49]
WO2016CN112625
Priority number, dateCN2016106688629.01.2016         Original published format: CN201610066886
[2018/49]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017128917
Date:03.08.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3409672
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3409672
Date:08.12.2021
Language:EN
[2021/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.08.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2019
ClassificationIPC:C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61K31/437, A61K31/519, A61P35/00, A61P37/00
[2019/28]
CPC:
C07D471/22 (EP,US); C07D471/04 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K31/437 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (KR); A61K31/519 (EP,US); A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US); A61P37/00 (EP,US); C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US); C07D487/04 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/49]C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61K31/437, A61K31/519, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PARAZOLDERIVATE MIT KONDENSIERTEM RING UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNG DAVON IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBSERKRANKUNGEN, ENTZÜNDUNGEN UND IMMUNERKRANKUNGEN[2018/49]
English:PARAZOLE CONDENSED-RING DERIVATIVES AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN TREATMENT OF CANCERS, INFLAMMATION AND IMMUNE DISEASES[2018/49]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE CYCLES CONDENSÉS DE PARAZOLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CES DERNIERS, ET APPLICATION DE CES DERNIERS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS, D'INFLAMMATION ET DE MALADIES IMMUNITAIRES[2018/49]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2018Translation filed 
28.08.2018National basic fee paid 
28.08.2018Search fee paid 
28.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
28.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
13.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2021Fee for grant paid
27.10.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.09.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[IDA]WO2015048689  (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.