blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3211082

EP3211082 - MICRORNA COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING MIR-21 ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2021
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.01.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.09.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 09.10.2024  [2024/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanofi
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2019/40]
Former [2017/35]For all designated states
Regulus Therapeutics Inc.
10614 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BHAT, Balkrishen
3545 Johns Hopkins Court
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2017/35]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2017/35]
Application number, filing date17153724.425.04.2012
[2017/35]
Priority number, dateUS201161478767P25.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161478767 P
US201161565779P01.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161565779 P
[2017/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3211082
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3211082
Date:17.02.2021
Language:EN
[2021/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2017
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/113, A61P35/00
[2017/35]
CPC:
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K31/7088 (KR); A61P1/00 (EP,IL);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL,KR); A61P11/00 (EP,IL); A61P13/02 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL,KR); A61P17/00 (EP,IL); A61P17/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P19/04 (EP,IL); A61P3/10 (EP,IL); A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL); A61P35/04 (EP,IL); A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL); A61P9/00 (EP,IL,KR); C12N2310/11 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/113 (EP,IL,KR,US); C12N2310/3231 (EP,IL,KR,US); C12N2310/343 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/35 (IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/13]
Former [2017/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA20.02.2018
ME20.02.2018
TitleGerman:MIRNA-VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DER MIR-21-AKTIVITÄT[2017/35]
English:MICRORNA COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING MIR-21 ACTIVITY[2017/35]
French:COMPOSÉS DE MICRO-ARN ET PROCÉDÉS POUR MODULER L'ACTIVITÉ MIR-21[2017/35]
Examination procedure30.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/13]
20.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2021Fee for grant paid
04.01.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.01.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12718549.4  / EP2702155
Divisional application(s)EP21157334.0  / EP3933040
Opposition(s)18.11.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.08.2019Request for further processing filed
01.08.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.08.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
20.06.2018Request for further processing filed
20.06.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.06.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.02.2021
CY17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
MK17.02.2021
MT17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
[2024/41]
Former [2024/22]AL17.02.2021
CY17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
MK17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
Former [2023/24]AL17.02.2021
CY17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
Former [2022/23]AL17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
Former [2022/10]AL17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
Former [2022/07]AL17.02.2021
LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
Former [2021/50]LV17.02.2021
MC17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
Former [2021/46]LV17.02.2021
SM17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
Former [2021/42]LV17.02.2021
IS17.06.2021
Former [2021/37]LV17.02.2021
Documents cited:Search[IA]WO2005013901  (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [IA]WO2007027894  (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [IA]WO2009043353  (SANTARIS PHARMA AS [DK], et al);
 [IA]WO2009058907  (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [IA]WO2009106367  (UNIV WUERZBURG J MAXIMILIANS [DE], et al);
 [IA]WO2010099161  (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al);
 [IA]EP2261333  (SANTARIS PHARMA AS [DK]);
 [IA]WO2010144485  (MIRAGEN THERAPEUTICS [US], et al);
by applicantUS2004171570
 WO2008042973
 US7399845
 US7427672
 WO2008150729
 WO2008154401
 WO2009006478
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.