EP3360771 - INSPECTION VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOsubsea AS Stenevik 5397 Bekkjarvik / NO | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ØSTERVOLD, TOR MIKAL ECOsubsea AS Stenevik 5397 BEKKJARVIK / NO | 02 /
ØSTERVOLD, KLAUS ECOsubsea AS Stenevik 5397 BEKKJARVIK / NO | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Protector IP AS Pilestredet 33 0166 Oslo / NO | [2020/29] |
Former [2018/33] | Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 17155653.3 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360771 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3360771 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B63B59/08 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
B63B59/08 (EP);
Y02T70/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INSPEKTIONSFAHRZEUG | [2018/33] | English: | INSPECTION VEHICLE | [2018/33] | French: | VÉHICULE D'INSPECTION | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 19.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 19.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 19.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2017 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | IE | 10.02.2021 | LU | 10.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 15.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005056382 (JOHNSON KEITH [AU], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract * * page 9, line 20 - line 25 * * page 13, line 12 - line 18 * [I] 2,4,5; | [X]US2010219003 (ROONEY III JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0061] , [0063] *; | [X]US2012006352 (HOLAPPA KENNETH W [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract ** paragraphs [0046] , [0064] *; | [XI]WO2015122780 (ECOSUBSEA AS [NO]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 5, line 20 - line 23; figure - * * page 6, line 33 - line 34 * * page 6, line 1 - line 19 * [I] 5,7 | Examination | US2014076223 |