EP3202420 - TRANSDERMAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A SERM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Besins Healthcare Luxembourg SARL 2-8 rue Julien Vesque 2668 Luxembourg / LU | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masini-Eteve, Valérie 4 rue Pierre Loti 92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 17157911.3 | 09.12.2009 | [2017/32] | Priority number, date | EP20080305924 | 11.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08305924 | US20080121848P | 11.12.2008 Original published format: US 121848 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202420 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202420 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/06, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K31/138, A61P35/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/4535 (EP,US);
A61K9/0041 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K31/138, A61K31/4535, A61P35/00, A61K9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM SERM | [2017/32] | English: | TRANSDERMAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A SERM | [2017/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES TRANSDERMIQUES COMPORTANT UN STROGÈNE SERM | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 24.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09764869.5 / EP2373305 | Divisional application(s) | EP20151652.3 / EP3656376 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | CY | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9924041 (CELLEGY PHARMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004175416 (TARAVELLA BRIGITTE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, paragraphs 12,15-17 * * page 2, paragraphs 27-34 * * page 3, paragraphs 45-47 * * claims 1-21 *; | [Y]WO2008070463 (JINA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claims 24-27,32 *; | [A] - YOUNG CHAI LIM ET AL, "Endoxifen (4-hydroxy-N-desmethyl-tamoxifen) has anti-estrogenic effects in breast cancer cells with potency similar to 4-hydroxy-tamoxifen", CANCER CHEMOTHERAPY AND PHARMACOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050501), vol. 55, no. 5, ISSN 1432-0843, pages 471 - 478, XP019334143 [A] 1-9 * page 472, column L, paragraph L - page 472, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00280-004-0926-7 | [A] - LEE K-H ET AL, "Quantification of tamoxifen and three metabolites in plasma by high-performance liquid chromatography with fluorescence detection: application to a clinical trial", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030705), vol. 791, no. 1-2, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 245 - 253, XP004428049 [A] 1-9 * page 247, column L, paragraph L - page 247, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1570-0232(03)00218-6 | [A] - MICHAEL D JOHNSON ET AL, "Pharmacological Characterization of 4-hydroxy-N-desmethyl Tamoxifen, a Novel Active Metabolite of Tamoxifen", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20040501), vol. 85, no. 2, ISSN 1573-7217, pages 151 - 159, XP019274612 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9527569 | WO9615045 | US5630531 | - POTTS; GUY, PHARM RES., (1992), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 663 - 9 | - CLEEK; BUNGE, PHARM RES, (1993), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 497 - 506 | - BALAKIN ET AL., CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 13, pages 223 - 241 |