blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3287123

EP3287123 - AQUEOUS PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION OF TAPENTADOL FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.07.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.03.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): RS
published on 21.08.2024  [2024/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grünenthal GmbH
Zieglerstrasse 6
52078 Aachen / DE
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / REINHOLD, Ulrich
I. Rote-Haag Weg 44a
52076 Aachen / DE
02 / SCHILLER, Marc
Max-Pechstein-Straße 4
52076 Aachen / DE
03 / WULSTEN, Eva Cornelia
Bonnenring 188
47877 Willich / DE
04 / INGHELBRECHT, Sabine Karine Katrien
c/o Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
05 / EMBRECHTS, Roger Carolus Augusta
c/o Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
06 / FEIL, Ulrich
Berliner Allee 17
63739 Aschaffenburg / DE
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[2020/17]
Former [2018/09]Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date17189271.402.03.2012
[2018/09]
Priority number, dateUS201161449287P04.03.2011         Original published format: US 201161449287 P
EP2011000360103.05.2011         Original published format: EP 11003601
[2018/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3287123
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3287123
Date:22.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61P25/04, A61K9/08, A61K47/02, A61K47/12, A61K31/137
[2019/14]
CPC:
A61K31/137 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US); A61K9/08 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K47/02 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,CN,IL,US); A61K47/186 (IL,KR); A61K9/00 (EA,IL);
A61K9/0053 (CN,IL,KR,US); A61K9/0095 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61P25/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/04 (EP,IL); A61P29/00 (IL,KR); Y02A50/30 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2018/09]A61K9/08, A61K31/137, A61K47/02, A61K47/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]
Former [2018/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNG VON TAPENTADOL ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG[2018/09]
English:AQUEOUS PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION OF TAPENTADOL FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION[2018/09]
French:FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE AQUEUSE DE TAPENTADOL POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE[2018/09]
Examination procedure04.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/40]
21.11.2018Observations by third parties
18.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2020Fee for grant paid
28.02.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.02.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12708672.6  / EP2680832
Divisional application(s)EP20154395.6  / EP3685827
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2021  01.02.2021  ADMISSIBLE
LABOMED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPAMY S.A.
Ioannou Metaxa 84
19441 Koropi, Attica / GR
Opponent's representative
Roukounas, Dimitrios
Dietlindenstraße 18
80802 München / DE
 [2021/10]
05.02.2021Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.06.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.07.2022Date of oral proceedings
01.03.2023Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.03.2023Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.07.2023Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/34]
Appeal following opposition16.03.2023Appeal received No.  T0552/23
16.03.2023Payment of appeal fee
07.07.2023Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
12.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipRS02.03.2012
AL22.04.2020
MK22.04.2020
SM22.04.2020
[2024/34]
Former [2024/22]AL22.04.2020
MK22.04.2020
SM22.04.2020
Former [2021/09]AL22.04.2020
SM22.04.2020
Former [2021/04]AL22.04.2020
Documents cited:Search[X]WO02067651  (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al);
 [AD]WO2007128412  (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al);
 [XD]WO2008110323  (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al);
 [X]US2010272815  (KHUNT MAYUR DEVJIBHAI [IN], et al);
by applicantWO02067651
 WO03035053
 WO2006002886
 US2007128412
 WO2007128412
 WO2007128413
 WO2008110323
 WO2009067703
 WO2009092601
otherWO02067651
 WO2008110323
OppositionWO02067651
 WO2008110323
 WO2008128740
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.