blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3299368

EP3299368 - NOVEL AMINO PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2021
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2021No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.02.2021  [2021/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2018/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Angst, Daniela
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
02 / Gessier, François
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
03 / Vulpetti, Anna
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
 [2018/13]
Representative(s)von Sprecher, Georg
Novartis Pharma AG
Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
[2018/13]
Application number, filing date17191467.428.11.2014
[2018/13]
Priority number, dateEP2013019508129.11.2013         Original published format: EP 13195081
[2018/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3299368
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3299368
Date:26.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:C07D403/12, C07D401/14, C07D401/10, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D239/47, A61P29/00, A61P35/02, A61K31/505, A61K31/506
[2019/36]
CPC:
C07D239/47 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/505 (EP,US); A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (KR); A61P29/00 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,US); C07D401/10 (EP,US); C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US); C07D403/12 (EP,US); C07D405/12 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2018/13]C07D403/12, C07D401/14, C07D401/10, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D239/47, A61P29/00, A61P35/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
Former [2018/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE AMINOPYRIMIDINDERIVATE[2018/13]
English:NOVEL AMINO PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES[2018/13]
French:NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS D'AMINO PYRIMIDINE[2018/13]
Examination procedure11.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
28.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2020Fee for grant paid
17.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14821285.5  / EP3074386
Divisional application(s)EP20158961.1  / EP3689865
EP23161775.4
Opposition(s)27.11.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM26.02.2020
[2020/48]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010100070  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-16* claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2013083666  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 *
by applicantWO0238561
 WO02102790
 WO03082859
 WO2004052359
 WO2004078163
 WO2005000833
 WO2005066156
 WO2010000633
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Printing Company, (19900000), pages 1289 - 1329
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.