blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3311666

EP3311666 - DIKETONES AND HYDROXYKETONES AS CATENIN SIGNALING PATHWAY ACTIVATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2022
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.04.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.12.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.11.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.07.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2022No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2022  [2022/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioSplice Therapeutics, Inc.
9360 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2021/20]
Former [2021/01]For all designated states
Samumed, LLC
9360 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Former [2018/17]For all designated states
Samumed, LLC
9381 Judicial Drive
Suite 160
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KC, Sunil Kumar
10504 Clasico Court
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
02 / WALLACE, David Mark
6448 Peinado Way
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
03 / HOOD, John
10831 Vereda Sol del Dios
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
04 / BARROGA, Charlene F.
8950 Costa Verde, No. 4237
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
 [2021/18]
Former [2018/17]01 / KC, Sunil Kumar
10504 Clasico Court
San Diego, CA California 92127 / US
02 / WALLACE, David Mark
6448 Peinado Way
San Diego, CA California 92121 / US
03 / HOOD, John
10831 Vereda Sol del Dios
San Diego, CA California 92130 / US
04 / BARROGA, Charlene F.
8950 Costa Verde, No. 4237
San Diego, CA California 92122 / US
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
3 Noble Street
London EC2V 7BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/17]D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date17193280.917.08.2011
[2018/17]
Priority number, dateUS20100374687P18.08.2010         Original published format: US 374687 P
US201061427974P29.12.2010         Original published format: US 201061427974 P
[2018/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3311666
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3311666
Date:05.05.2021
Language:EN
[2021/18]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP3311666
Date:23.06.2021
[2021/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2018
ClassificationIPC:A01N35/00, A61K31/12, C07D319/18, C07D405/06, C07D405/10, C07D407/10, C07D409/06, C07D409/10, C07C49/784, C07D213/50, A61P25/00
[2018/17]
CPC:
A61K31/4436 (EP,US); C07D319/18 (EP,CN,US); A61K31/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/357 (EP,US); A61K31/381 (EP,US); A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K31/4433 (EP,US); A61K9/0014 (US); A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP); A61P17/02 (EP); A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP); A61P19/00 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP); A61P19/10 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP); A61P25/16 (EP); A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP); A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP); A61P7/06 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP); C07C49/784 (EP,US); C07D213/50 (EP,US);
C07D319/16 (EP,US); C07D405/06 (EP,US); C07D405/10 (EP,US);
C07D407/10 (EP,US); C07D409/06 (EP,US); C07D409/10 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Former [2018/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DIKETONE UND HYDROXYKETONE ALS CATENINSIGNALWEG-AKTIVATOREN[2018/17]
English:DIKETONES AND HYDROXYKETONES AS CATENIN SIGNALING PATHWAY ACTIVATORS[2018/17]
French:DICÉTONES ET HYDROXYDICÉTONES UTILES EN TANT QU'ACTIVATEURS DE LA VOIE DE SIGNALISATION DE LA CATÉNINE[2018/17]
Examination procedure25.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
25.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.12.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.03.2021Fee for grant paid
26.03.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11818727.7  / EP2605652
Divisional application(s)EP21167222.5  / EP3915367
Opposition(s)08.02.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
27.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010075551  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al)
by applicantWO8705297
 US4761471
 WO9011366
 WO0153268
 WO2005009997
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.