EP3293129 - STORAGE SYSTEM AND A LOAD HANDLING DEVICE FOR OCCUPYING ONLYE ONE GRID SPACE IN A STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/11] | A LOAD HANDLING DEVICE FOR OCCUPYING ONLYE ONE GRID SPACE IN A STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
[2019/25] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, HERTS AL10 9UL / GB | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBO, Lars, Sverker, Ture Ocado Innovation Limited, The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, HERTS AL10 9UL / GB | 02 /
STADIE, Robert Ocado Innovation Limited, The Legal Department 1 Trident Place, Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | 03 /
WHELAN, Matthew Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department,1 Trident Place, Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | 04 /
BRETT, Christopher Ocado Innovation Limited, The Legal Department 1 Trident Place, Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor, et al c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock, PL19 9DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17198905.6 | 24.07.2014 | [2018/11] | Priority number, date | GB20130014313 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: GB 201314313 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293129 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3293129 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
B65G1/0464 (EP,AT,FI,GB,IL,KR,US);
B65G1/04 (CZ,DK,EA,FI,GB,IL,PL);
B65G1/0414 (FI,GB,IL);
B61B13/00 (IL);
B61C9/46 (IL);
B61D15/00 (IL);
B65G1/0457 (GB,IL);
B65G1/0478 (KR);
B65G1/0492 (DK,GB,IL,US);
B65G1/065 (GB,IL,KR);
B65G57/03 (FI,IL,US);
B65G59/02 (FI,IL,US);
F16H7/02 (IL);
G06Q10/08 (EP);
G06Q10/087 (EP);
B65G2201/0235 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2018/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPEICHERSYSTEM UND LASTHANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM BELEGEN EINES EINZIGEN GITTERRAUMS IN EINEM SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2019/30] | English: | STORAGE SYSTEM AND A LOAD HANDLING DEVICE FOR OCCUPYING ONLYE ONE GRID SPACE IN A STORAGE SYSTEM | [2019/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION DE CHARGE POUR OCCUPER UN SEUL ESPACE DE GRILLE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE | [2019/25] |
Former [2018/11] | LASTHANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM BELEGEN EINES EINZIGEN GITTERRAUM IN EINEM SPEICHERSYSTEM | ||
Former [2018/11] | A LOAD HANDLING DEVICE FOR OCCUPYING ONLYE ONE GRID SPACE IN A STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
Former [2018/11] | DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION DE CHARGE POUR OCCUPER UN SEUL ESPACE DE GRILLE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 28.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14755893.6 / EP3030504 | Divisional application(s) | EP19211561.6 / EP3632821 | EP20207331.8 / EP3795501 | EP21188812.8 / EP3922582 | EP21188956.3 Application withdrawn : 02.08.2021 | EP21203151.2 / EP3967629 | EP21214873.8 Application withdrawn : 06.04.2022 | EP22159000.3 Application withdrawn : 28.02.2022 | EP22159003.7 Application withdrawn : 28.02.2022 | EP22188104.8 / EP4101791 | EP23150344.2 Application withdrawn : 10.03.2023 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2020
27.08.2020
ADMISSIBLE Gebhardt Fördertechnik GmbH Neulandstraße 28 74889 Sinsheim / DE Opponent's representative Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02
27.08.2020
27.07.2023
WITHDRAWN AutoStore Technology AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO Opponent's representative Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2023/35] |
Former [2020/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2020
27.08.2020
ADMISSIBLE Gebhardt Fördertechnik GmbH Neulandstraße 28 74889 Sinsheim / DE Opponent's representative Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02
27.08.2020
02.09.2020
ADMISSIBLE AutoStore Technology AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO Opponent's representative Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | |||
Former [2020/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2020
27.08.2020
ADMISSIBLE Gebhardt Fördertechnik GmbH Neulandstraße 28 74889 Sinsheim / DE Opponent's representative Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 16.12.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.09.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/42] | Appeal following opposition | 18.04.2023 | Appeal received No. T0719/23 | 18.04.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 20.06.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.09.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 27.11.2019 | |
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 27.11.2019 | |
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 27.11.2019 | |
BG | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10203647 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [XA]DE19935742 (KLEIN JUERGEN [DE]); | [XDA]NO317366B (AUTOSTORE AS [NO]); | [XA]DE102009017241 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XP]WO2014090684 (JAKOB HATTELAND LOGISTICS AS [NO]) | by applicant | US2701065 | WO9849075 | EP0767113 | NO317366B | WO2013GB51215 | Opposition | JPH10203647 | JPH10299280 | NO317366B | US2008075569 | US2008075568 | US7381022 | US2009074545 | US2011168465 | CN103612882 | WO2014090684 | WO2014195902 | WO2014203126 | WO2015140216 | GB1310784 | US4088232 | DE4203823 | DE19849391 | US6429016 | US6572319 | EP1037828 | US2003229416 | WO2006095047 | US2011027059 | DE102009050585 | US2011243698 | EP2548822 | WO2013167907 | NO20140773 | WO2015193278 |