EP3405212 - CANCER VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINDER, Joseph John 12282 Cornwallis Square San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 02 /
CHO, Helen Kim 4127 Twilight Ridge San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
COCKLE, Paul Jason 126 Redwood Road San Anselmo, CA 94960 / US | 04 /
FALCONER, Derek John 4651 Torrey Circle Apt. K302 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
GURU, Siradanahalli 10515 Abalone Landing Terrace San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 06 /
JOOSS, Karin Ute 3712 Garden Lane San Diego, CA 92106 / US | 07 /
MARTINIC, Marianne Marcela Andrea 8623 Via Mallorca Unit C La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 08 /
WILLS, Kenneth Nelson 7806 Via Opuntia Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 17702951.9 | 16.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017IB50229 | Priority number, date | US201662280636P | 19.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662280636 P | US201662419190P | 08.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662419190 P | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017125844 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405212 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3405212 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K40/4257 (KR);
A61K31/711 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/001157 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K39/00117 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K48/005 (IL,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4727 (KR);
C12N15/62 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/57 (IL,US);
A61K2039/575 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/585 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/70 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/812 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFFE GEGEN KREBS | [2020/04] | English: | CANCER VACCINES | [2018/48] | French: | VACCINS CONTRE LE CANCER | [2020/04] |
Former [2018/48] | KREBSIMPFSTOFFE | ||
Former [2018/48] | VACCINS ANTICANCÉREUX | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 20.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20175571.7 / EP3733201 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MK | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 08.07.2020 | |
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | HR | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 08.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2013025972 (GLOBEIMMUNE INC [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0187702 | US4603112 | US4769330 | WO8901973 | WO9011092 | WO9014837 | US5017487 | WO9115501 | US5091309 | US5217879 | US5219740 | US5283185 | US5288641 | WO9526356 | US5527928 | EP0735898 | US5580859 | US5589466 | US5591624 | EP0761231 | US5688688 | US5716613 | US5716826 | US5716832 | EP0835318 | US5789245 | WO9837919 | WO9840100 | US5814482 | US5817491 | WO9852581 | US5843723 | WO9855495 | US5851529 | WO9857659 | WO9911241 | WO9944636 | WO9952549 | WO0056358 | WO0062800 | WO0114424 | WO0121207 | WO0121152 | WO03041070 | US6682736 | WO2005071093 | US7387882 | WO2010005958 | WO2010086189 | US8088803 | WO2015063647 | WO2015173764 | US2015329525 |