EP3426111 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR FROTHING MILK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNIP, Abram Christiaan c/o Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | 02 /
PATER, Eduard c/o Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17715819.3 | 09.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017NL50149 | Priority number, date | NL20162016400 | 09.03.2016 Original published format: NL 2016400 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017155403 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426111 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3426111 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, A23F5/26 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
A47J31/4485 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A47J31/4489 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A47J31/44 (IL,RU);
A23F5/26 (EP,IL,US);
A23L2/54 (IL,US);
A47J31/461 (IL,KR);
A47J31/468 (IL,KR);
A47J31/52 (IL,KR,US);
F25D25/005 (IL,US);
A23V2002/00 (IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | A47J31/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFSCHÄUMEN VON MILCH | [2019/03] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR FROTHING MILK | [2019/03] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE MOUSSE DE LAIT | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 19.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2020 | Observations by third parties | 03.09.2021 | Observations by third parties | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008083941 (STEINER WEGGIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2294952 (SCHAERER AG [CH]) [A] 1-19 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE202012009074U (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH]) [A] 1-19 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE202012009076U (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH]) [A] 1-19* figure 1 *; | [A]EP2987435 (FRANKE KAFFEEMASCHINEN AG [CH]) [A] 1-19 * figure 3 * | Examination | EP1593330 | EP1380243 | WO2008083941 | EP2294952 | DE202012009074U | DE202012009076U | EP2869742 | EP2881019 | EP2881020 | EP2987435 | EP2583036 | by applicant | EP0485350 | WO2008083941 | WO2008120991 | EP2120656 | other | EP1593330 | EP2583036 | EP2881020 | EP2881019 |