EP3465104 - FLOWMETER ARRANGEMENT FOR A FLOWLINE OR JUMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vetco Gray Scandinavia AS Eyvind Lyches vei 10 1338 Sandvika / NO | [2021/44] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Vetco Gray Scandinavia AS Eyvind Lyches vei 10 1338 Sandvika / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESTETUN, Steinar Lindemann Eyvind Lyches vei 10 1338 Sandvika / NO | [2021/44] |
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
HESTETUN, Steinar Lindemann Eyvind Lyches vei 10 NO-1338 Sandvika / NO | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/44] |
Former [2019/15] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17728466.8 | 25.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP62700 | Priority number, date | NO20160000910 | 27.05.2016 Original published format: NO 20160910 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017203013 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465104 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3465104 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01F15/18, E21B47/01, E21B17/02, E21B41/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G01F15/185 (EP,US);
G01F15/10 (NO);
E21B47/017 (NO);
G01F15/18 (NO)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSSMESSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE FLUSSLEITUNG ODER ÜBERBRÜCKUNGSLEITUNG | [2021/29] | English: | FLOWMETER ARRANGEMENT FOR A FLOWLINE OR JUMPER | [2019/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE DÉBITMÈTRE POUR UNE CONDUITE D'ÉCOULEMENT OU UN RACCORDEMENT | [2021/29] |
Former [2019/15] | DURCHFLUSSMESSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE FLUSSLEITUNG ODER BRÜCKE | ||
Former [2019/15] | AGENCEMENT DE DÉBITMÈTRE POUR UNE CONDUITE D'ÉCOULEMENT OU UN CAVALIER | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 17.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2020 | Decision despatched | 17.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2017 | AL | 03.11.2021 | AT | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | CZ | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | ES | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MC | 03.11.2021 | MK | 03.11.2021 | MT | 03.11.2021 | NL | 03.11.2021 | PL | 03.11.2021 | RO | 03.11.2021 | RS | 03.11.2021 | SI | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | TR | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | GR | 04.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | PT | 03.03.2022 | IE | 25.05.2022 | LU | 25.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | FR | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.05.2017 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
MK | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
TR | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.05.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.05.2017 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
MK | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.05.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.05.2017 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.05.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.05.2017 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.05.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.05.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.05.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.05.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US1988003 (FORD JOHN L) [I] 1,4 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 69; figures 7, 8, 9, 10 * [A] 2,3,5-10; | [IA]US2576630 (MUELLER FRANK H, et al) [I] 1,4 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 48; figures 1, 4 * [A] 2,3,5-10; | [IA]US4768385 (CAGE DONALD R [US]) [I] 1,4 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 18; figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5-10; | [IA]EP0763720 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [I] 1 * column 1, lines 31-44 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 43; figures 1, 2 * [A] 2-10; | [A]US2014041463 (VETHE EIVIND [NO], et al) [A] 4,5* paragraphs [0091] - [0092]; figures 3, 6 *; | [XI]US2015292291 (DONALD IAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0007] , [0088] - [0091] - [0 99] - [0100]; figures 1, 6 * [I] 4 |