blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3490401

EP3490401 - SAFETY CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.05.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.02.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.2024  [2024/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reil, Goran
521 W. Rosecrans Avenue
Gardena, CA 90248 / US
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / REIL, Vladimir
521 W. Rosecrans Avenue
Gardena, CA 90248 / US
02 / REIL, Goran
521 W. Rosecrans Avenue
Gardena, CA 90248 / US
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Postfach 70 04 25
81304 München / DE
[2019/23]
Application number, filing date17749025.725.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017US43658
Priority number, dateUS20161522244328.07.2016         Original published format: US201615222443
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018022579
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3490401
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3490401
Date:18.10.2023
Language:EN
[2023/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:A44C15/00, A44C7/00
[2019/23]
CPC:
A44C7/003 (EP,IL,KR,US); A44C15/00 (IL,RU); A44C15/0045 (IL,KR);
A44C15/0035 (EP,IL,US); B21D22/02 (IL,US); A44D2201/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
Y10T24/41 (EP,IL,US); Y10T29/4959 (IL,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSKUPPLUNG[2019/23]
English:SAFETY CLUTCH[2019/23]
French:FIXATION DE SÉCURITÉ[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2019National basic fee paid 
21.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
21.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2023Fee for grant paid
05.09.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)19.07.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4397067  (RAPSEIK CHRISTOPHER S);
 [X]JPS60158413U  ;
 [A]EP1297760  (IMEX CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]JP2008237267  (MARUYAMA INC)
ExaminationUS2011191991
by applicantUS4501050
 US4527563
 US4921494
 US5496343
 US5792170
 US5868774
 US6599306
 US6796990
 US7955349
 US8365369
 US8372106
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.