blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3519942

EP3519942 - PERFORM SIGN OPERATION DECIMAL INSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.10.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.07.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.04.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
[2019/32]
Inventor(s)01 / COPELAND, Reid
IBM CANADA LTD
8200 Warden Ave
Toronto Lab
Markham, Ontario L6G 1C7 / CA
02 / MUELLER, Silvia, Melitta
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GmbH
Schoenaicher Str. 220
71032 Boeblingen / DE
03 / BRADBURY, Jonathan
IBM CORPORATION
2455 South RD
Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US
04 / SLEGEL, Timothy
IBM CORPORATION
2455 South RD
Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US
 [2019/32]
Representative(s)IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2023/45]
Former [2019/32]Graham, Timothy Abbey
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date17791582.422.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017EP74091
Priority number, dateUS20161528117330.09.2016         Original published format: US201615281173
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018060102
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3519942
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3519942
Date:08.11.2023
Language:EN
[2023/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/30
[2019/32]
CPC:
G06F9/30014 (EP,IL,RU,US); G06F7/544 (IL,KR,RU,US); G06F9/3001 (IL,KR,RU,US);
G06F9/30025 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US); G06F9/30036 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US); G06F9/30038 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06F9/30094 (EP,IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DEZIMALE ANWEISUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER SIGNALOPERATION[2019/32]
English:PERFORM SIGN OPERATION DECIMAL INSTRUCTION[2019/32]
French:INSTRUCTION DÉCIMALE POUR EFFECTUER UNE OPÉRATION DE SIGNES[2019/32]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2019National basic fee paid 
11.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
11.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2023Fee for grant paid
28.09.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.08.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHR08.11.2023
MC08.11.2023
RS08.11.2023
SM08.11.2023
[2025/22]
Former [2024/33]HR08.11.2023
RS08.11.2023
SM08.11.2023
Former [2024/24]HR08.11.2023
RS08.11.2023
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.