blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3518933

EP3518933 - METHODS OF TREATING UTERINE FIBROIDS AND ENDOMETRIOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.01.2025
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.02.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.09.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.04.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2025Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 26.02.2025  [2025/09]
24.01.2025Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 26.02.2025  [2025/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Pharma Switzerland GmbH
Aeschengraben 27
4051 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2024/35]
Former [2023/02]For all designated states
Myovant Sciences GmbH
Aeschengraben 27
Floor 22
4051 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
Former [2022/51]For all designated states
Myovant Sciences GmbH
Aschengraben 27
Floor 22
4051 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
Former [2019/32]For all designated states
Myovant Sciences GmbH
Viaduktstrasse 8
4051 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Brendan Mark
2017 Markham Drive
Chapel Hill North Carolina, 27514 / US
02 / SEELY, Lynn
537 Occidental Avenue
San Mateo California, 94402 / US
03 / MUDD, JR., Paul N.
302 Beacon Falls Court
Cary North Carolina 27519 / US
04 / WOLLOWITZ, Susan
32 Topper Court
Lafayette California 94549 / US
05 / HIBBERD, Mark
The Old House
Hawkley
Liss Hampshire GU33 6NQ / GB
06 / TANIMOTO, Masataka
c/o Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8645 / JP
07 / RAJASEKHAR, Vijaykumar Reddy
20200 Quail Hollow Road
Apple Valley California 92308 / US
08 / SUKHATME, Mayukh Vasant
c/o Roivant Sciences
320 W 37th St
New York New York, 10018 / US
 [2023/02]
Former [2021/42]01 / JOHNSON, Brendan Mark
2017 Markham Drive
27514 Chapel Hill North Carolina / US
02 / SEELY, Lynn
537 Occidental Avenue
San Mateo California, 94402 / US
03 / MUDD, JR., Paul N.
302 Beacon Falls Court
Cary North Carolina 27519 / US
04 / WOLLOWITZ, Susan
32 Topper Court
Lafayette California 94549 / US
05 / HIBBERD, Mark
The Old House
Hawkley
Liss Hampshire GU33 6NQ / GB
06 / TANIMOTO, Masataka
c/o Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8645 / JP
07 / RAJASEKHAR, Vijaykumar Reddy
20200 Quail Hollow Road
Apple Valley California 92308 / US
08 / SUKHATME, Mayukh Vasant
c/o Roivant Sciences
320 W 37th St
New York New York, 10018 / US
Former [2019/32]01 / JOHNSON, Brendan Mark
2017 Markham Drive
Chapel Hill North Carolina 27514 / US
02 / SEELY, Lynn
537 Occidental Avenue
San Mateo California, 94402 / US
03 / MUDD, JR., Paul N.
302 Beacon Falls Court
Cary North Carolina 27519 / US
04 / WOLLOWITZ, Susan
32 Topper Court
Lafayette California 94549 / US
05 / HIBBERD, Mark
The Old House
Hawkley
Liss Hampshire GU33 6NQ / GB
06 / TANIMOTO, Masataka
c/o Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP
07 / RAJASEKHAR, Vijaykumar Reddy
20200 Quail Hollow Road
Apple Valley California 92308 / US
08 / SUKHATME, Mayukh Vasant
c/o Roivant Sciences
320 W 37th St
New York New York, 10018 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
P.O. Box 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
[2025/09]
Former [2019/32]Nieuwenhuys, William Francis
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
Application number, filing date17823018.129.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017EP74907
Priority number, dateUS201662402034P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662402034 P
US201662402055P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662402055 P
US201662402150P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662402150 P
US201762492839P01.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762492839 P
US201762528409P03.07.2017         Original published format: US 201762528409 P
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2018060501
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3518933
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3518933
Date:16.03.2022
Language:EN
[2022/11]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP3518933
Date:26.02.2025
Language:EN
[2025/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/513, A61K31/565, A61K31/57, A61P15/00
[2019/32]
CPC:
A61K31/513 (EP,IL,US); A61K31/519 (IL,US); A61K31/565 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,IL,US); A61K9/0053 (IL,US); A61P15/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Extension statesBA30.04.2019
ME30.04.2019
Validation statesMA30.04.2019
MD30.04.2019
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEBÄRMUTTERMYOMEN UND ENDOMETRIOSE[2019/32]
English:METHODS OF TREATING UTERINE FIBROIDS AND ENDOMETRIOSIS[2019/32]
French:MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DES FIBROMES UTÉRINS ET DE L'ENDOMÉTRIOSE[2019/32]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2019National basic fee paid 
30.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
30.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.02.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
17.04.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.06.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2022Fee for grant paid
04.02.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.02.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP22162349.9  / EP4094766
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.12.2022  16.12.2022  ADMISSIBLE
SANDOZ AG
Centralbahnstrasse 4
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 [2025/09]
Former [2024/04]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2022  16.12.2022  ADMISSIBLE
SANDOZ AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2023/04]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2022  16.12.2022  ADMISSIBLE
SANDOZ AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstraße 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2023/03]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2022   
SANDOZ AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstraße 2
80538 München / DE
04.01.2023Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.05.2023Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.04.2024Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.04.2024Date of oral proceedings
29.05.2024Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.05.2024Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.09.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Request for further processing for:17.04.2020Request for further processing filed
17.04.2020Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.2020Decision despatched
17.04.2020Request for further processing filed
17.04.2020Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.2020Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201903   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2019
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2023/02]
Former [2022/49]SK16.03.2022
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2014143669  (ABBVIE INC [US]);
by applicantUS7300935
 US8058280
 US8735401
 US9346822
 WO2016136849
 US9758528
OppositionUS402034
 US402055
 US402150
 US492839
 US528409
 EP0074907
 WO2014143669
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.