EP3554534 - INSULIN CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORRMAN, Mathias Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
HOSTRUP, Susanne Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
STEENSGAARD, Dorte, Bjerre Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
STRAUSS, Holger, Martin Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 05 /
HANSEN, Rosa, Rebecca, Erritzøe Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 06 /
HAVELUND, Svend Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 07 /
SCHLEIN, Morten Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 08 /
PEDERSEN, Jesper, Søndergaard Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17832941.3 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017EP83013 | Priority number, date | EP20160204688 | 16.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16204688 | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018109162 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554534 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3554534 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/28, A61P5/48, A61K33/30, A61K47/10 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
A61K38/28 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/26 (CN,IL,KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/10 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61P3/00 (CN,IL,RU);
A61P3/04 (CN,IL);
A61P3/06 (CN,IL);
A61P3/10 (CN,IL,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K38/28, A61K38/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | A61K38/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 16.07.2019 | TN | 16.07.2019 | Title | German: | INSULINHALTIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2019/43] | English: | INSULIN CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2019/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DE L'INSULINE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20208962.9 / EP3821905 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | LU | 15.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | EE | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 23.06.2021 | |
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | LT | 23.06.2021 | |
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 23.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2009115469 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [AD]WO2013153000 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [A]WO2015052088 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) | by applicant | WO2006097537 | WO2009063072 | WO2009115469 | WO2013153000 |