blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3338765

EP3338765 - STEROID DERIVATIVE FOR THE DELIVERY OF MRNA IN HUMAN GENETIC DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Translate Bio, Inc.
29 Hartwell Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
[2018/26]
Inventor(s)01 / GUILD, Braydon, Charles
109 Riverdale Road
Concord, MA Massachusetts 01742 / US
02 / DEROSA, Frank
26 Mount Auburn Street
Chelmsford, MA Massachusetts 01824 / US
03 / HEARTLEIN, Michael
167 Reed Farm Road
Boxborough, MA Massachusetts 01719 / US
04 / CONCINO, Michael
297 Long Hill Road
Bolton, MA Massachusetts 01740 / US
 [2018/26]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2018/26]
Application number, filing date18156531.830.11.2010
[2018/26]
Priority number, dateUS20090265653P01.12.2009         Original published format: US 265653 P
[2018/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3338765
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3338765
Date:19.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/127, A61K48/00, A61K31/7105, C07H21/02
[2018/26]
CPC:
A61K31/7105 (EP,US); A61K48/0033 (US); A61K48/0008 (US);
A61K48/005 (EP,US); A61K9/0019 (EP,US); A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US); A61K9/1272 (EP,US); A61K9/5123 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP); C07J43/003 (US); C12N15/67 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/27]
Former [2018/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA24.05.2018
ME24.05.2018
TitleGerman:STEROIDDERIVAT ZUR AUSGABE VON MRNA BEI HUMANGENETISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2018/26]
English:STEROID DERIVATIVE FOR THE DELIVERY OF MRNA IN HUMAN GENETIC DISEASES[2018/26]
French:DÉRIVÉ DE STÉROÏDÉE SUITABLE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'ARNM DANS DES MALADIES GÉNÉTIQUES HUMAINES[2018/26]
Examination procedure13.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
27.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.10.2018Fee for grant paid
16.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.11.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
07.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10835016.6  / EP2506857
Divisional application(s)EP18167995.2  / EP3403647
EP22181362.9
Opposition(s)20.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9011092  (VICAL INC [US], et al);
by applicantUS4737323
 US4897355
 US4920016
 US4946683
 US5171678
 US5194654
 US5223263
 US5334761
 US5677124
 US5744335
 US5885613
 WO2005121348
 US19970835281
 US19980083294
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.