blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3360575

EP3360575 - TRANSDERMAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ACTIVE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.03.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Besins Healthcare Luxembourg SARL
2-8 rue Julien Vesque
2668 Luxembourg / LU
[2018/33]
Inventor(s)01 / MASINI-ETEVE, Valérie
4 rue Pierre Loti
92340 Bourg La Reine / FR
02 / CANET, Denis
c/o Besins Healthcare SA Avenue Louise 287
1050 Bruxelles / BE
 [2018/33]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2018/33]
Application number, filing date18163659.827.10.2010
[2018/33]
Priority number, dateUS200925524109P27.10.2009         Original published format: US 25524109 P
EP2009017876210.12.2009         Original published format: EP 09178762
[2018/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3360575
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3360575
Date:19.04.2023
Language:EN
[2023/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K31/565, A61K31/568, A61K31/57, A61K31/56, A61K31/566, A61K31/573, A61K9/00, A61P5/00, A61P43/00
[2020/48]
CPC:
A61K31/56 (EP,RU,US); A61K31/565 (EP,RU,US); A61K31/566 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/568 (EP,RU,US); A61K31/57 (EP,RU,US); A61K31/573 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,RU,US); A61K47/12 (EP,RU,US); A61K47/14 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,RU,US); A61K9/06 (EP,RU,US); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2018/33]A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K31/565, A61K31/568, A61K31/57, A61K31/56, A61K31/566, A61K31/573
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
TitleGerman:TRANSDERMALE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT WIRKSTOFFEN[2018/33]
English:TRANSDERMAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ACTIVE AGENTS[2018/33]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES TRANSDERMIQUES COMPRENANT DES PRINCIPES ACTIFS[2018/33]
Examination procedure23.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/33]
23.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2021Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.07.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2023Fee for grant paid
09.03.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10768983.8  / EP2493508
Opposition(s)22.01.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
15.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
30.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 11
21.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 12
27.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.04.2023
[2024/12]
Documents cited:Search[A]GB880276  (UPJOHN CO);
 [I]US5232703  (BLANK IZHAK [IL]);
 [I]US2004175416  (TARAVELLA BRIGITTE [FR], et al);
 [I]WO2004091631  (UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [I]WO2006040196  (BESINS INT LAB [FR], et al);
 [A]US2006239929  (DOW GORDON J [US], et al);
 [I]US2007082039  (JONES GERALD S JR [US], et al);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.