blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3415517

EP3415517 - CRYSTALLINE FORM OF 1-(4-1-(2,6-DIFLUOROBENZYL)-5-DIMETHYLAMINOMETHYL-3-(6-METHOXYPYRIDAZIN-3-YL)-2,4-DIOXO-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROTHIENO(2,3-D)-PYRIMIDIN-6YL)PHENYL)-3-METHOXYUREA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.03.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.11.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.05.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.03.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2023No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.03.2023  [2023/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2018/51]
Inventor(s)01 / MIWA, Kazuhiro
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome
Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0024 / JP
02 / SASAKI, Tsuyoshi
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome
Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0024 / JP
03 / KOMURA, Fumiya
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome
Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0024 / JP
 [2018/51]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[2022/16]
Former [2018/51]Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date18185835.827.09.2013
[2018/51]
Priority number, dateJP2012021767928.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012217679
[2018/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3415517
Date:19.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3415517
Date:20.04.2022
Language:EN
[2022/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2018
ClassificationIPC:C07D495/04, A61P5/02, A61P15/08
[2020/46]
CPC:
C07D495/04 (EP,CN,US); C07D333/38 (CN,US); C07D409/12 (US)
Former IPC [2018/51]C07D495/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
Former [2018/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KRISTALLINE FORM VON 1-(4-1-(2,6-DIFLUOROBENZYL)-5-DIMETHYLAMINOMETHYL-3-(6-METHOXYPYRIDAZIN-3-YL)-2,4-DIOXO-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROTHIENO(2,3-D)-PYRIMIDIN-6YL)PHENYL)-3-METHOXYUREA[2018/51]
English:CRYSTALLINE FORM OF 1-(4-1-(2,6-DIFLUOROBENZYL)-5-DIMETHYLAMINOMETHYL-3-(6-METHOXYPYRIDAZIN-3-YL)-2,4-DIOXO-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROTHIENO(2,3-D)-PYRIMIDIN-6YL)PHENYL)-3-METHOXYUREA[2018/51]
French:FORME CRISTALLINE DU 1-(4-1-(2,6-DIFLUOROBENZYL)-5-DIMETHYLAMINOMETHYL-3-(6-METHOXYPYRIDAZIN-3-YL)-2,4-DIOXO-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROTHIENO(2,3-D)-PYRIMIDIN-6YL)PHENYL)-3-METHOXYUREA[2018/51]
Examination procedure04.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/28]
04.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
27.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2021Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.05.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2021Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2022Fee for grant paid
09.03.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13779938.3  / EP2900675
Divisional application(s)EP22168256.0  / EP4119564
Opposition(s)23.01.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
30.09.2019Request for further processing filed
30.09.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.10.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1591446  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]);
by applicantWO0056739
 WO2004067535
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.