EP3456717 - 4,6-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILE DERIVATIVE AS CANCER OSAKA THYROID (COT) MODULATOR FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/12] | TABLETS CONTAINING 4,6-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILE DERIVATIVES AS CANCER OSAKA THYROID (COT) MODULATORS FOR TREATING CANCER | ||
[2020/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACON, Elizabeth, M. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 02 /
BALAN, Gayatri c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 03 /
CHOU, Chien-Hung c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Christopher, T. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 05 /
COTTELL, Jeromy, J. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 06 /
KIM, Musong c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 07 /
KIRSCHBERG, Thorsten, A. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 08 /
LINK, John, O. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 09 /
PHILLIPS, Gary c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 10 /
SCHROEDER, Scott, D. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 11 /
SQUIRES, Neil, H. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 12 /
STEVENS, Kirk, L. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 13 /
TAYLOR, James, G. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 14 /
WATKINS, William, J. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 15 /
WRIGHT, Nathan, E. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 16 /
ZIPFEL, Sheila, M. c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 18186568.4 | 30.06.2016 | [2019/12] | Priority number, date | US201562189158P | 06.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562189158 P | US201562269060P | 17.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562269060 P | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3456717 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3456717 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D413/14, C07D401/12, C07D409/14, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, C07D495/04, C07D498/04, A61K31/4709, A61P35/00, A61P29/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07D215/44 (BR);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4709 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP,IL);
A61P1/02 (EP,IL);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P1/06 (EP,IL);
A61P1/08 (EP,IL);
A61P1/12 (EP,IL);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P11/06 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P17/00 (EP,IL);
A61P17/06 (EP,BR,IL);
A61P17/14 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P19/06 (EP,IL);
A61P19/08 (EP,IL);
A61P21/02 (EP,IL);
A61P21/04 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/04 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/02 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,BR,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR);
A61P37/00 (BR);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,BR,IL);
A61P5/50 (EP,IL);
A61P7/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/06 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/06 (EP,IL);
C07B59/002 (IL,US);
C07D215/42 (BR);
C07D401/12 (EP,IL,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D413/14, C07D401/12, C07D409/14, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, C07D495/04, A61K31/4709, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] |
Former [2019/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | 19.09.2019 | Title | German: | 4,6-DIAMINO-CHINOLIN-3-CARBONITRIL DERIVAT ALS KREBS OSAKA THYROID (COT) MODULATOR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHER ERKRANKUNG | [2021/10] | English: | 4,6-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILE DERIVATIVE AS CANCER OSAKA THYROID (COT) MODULATOR FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY DISEASE | [2021/10] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE 4,6-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILE EN TANT QUE MODULATEUR DE CANCER OSAKA THYROID (COT) POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIE INFLAMMATOIRE | [2021/10] |
Former [2019/12] | TABLETTEN ENTHALTEND 4,6-DIAMINO-CHINOLIN-3-CARBONITRIL DERIVATE ALS KREBS OSAKA THYROID (COT) MODULATOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | ||
Former [2019/12] | TABLETS CONTAINING 4,6-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILE DERIVATIVES AS CANCER OSAKA THYROID (COT) MODULATORS FOR TREATING CANCER | ||
Former [2019/12] | COMPRIMÉS CONTAINANT DÉRIVÉS DE 4,6-DIAMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILE EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DE CANCER OSAKA THYROID (COT) POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | Examination procedure | 19.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 19.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16738976.6 / EP3191470 | Divisional application(s) | EP21162393.9 / EP3896064 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2016 | AL | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | DK | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | FI | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | MT | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | LU | 30.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 30.06.2016 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.06.2016 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | EE | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9843960 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | by applicant | US3845770 | US4326525 | US4902514 | US4992445 | US5001139 | US5023252 | US5616345 |