EP3461240 - PROCESSES, SYSTEMS, AND APPARATUS FOR CYLOTRON PRODUCTION OF TECHNETIUM-99M [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Triumf Inc. 4004 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver, BC V6T 2A3 / CA | [2022/25] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Triumf 4004 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 2A3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFFER, Paul 74-10200 Fourth Avenue Richmond, British Columbia V7E 1V3 / CA | 02 /
BENARD, Francois 3505 23 Avenue West Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 4E6 / CA | 03 /
BUCKLEY, Kenneth R. 3109 Trafalgar Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6K 3V2 / CA | 04 /
HANEMAAYER, Victoire No. 1-20681 Thorne Ave Maple Ridge, British Columbia V2X 8G2 / CA | 05 /
KLUG, Julius Alexander 1606 East 29th Avenue Vancouver, BC, V5N 2Y6 / CA | 06 /
KOVACS, Michael S. 38-782 Viscount Road London, Ontario N6J 4E7 / CA | 07 /
MORLEY, Thomas J. 411 D Street, apt 612 Boston, MA Massachusetts 02210 / US | 08 /
RUTH, Thomas J 2263 Redbud Lane A., Apt. No. 102 Vancouver, BC V6K 4V7 / CA | 09 /
VALLIANT, John 15 Holkham Avenue Ancaster, Ontario L9K 1N8 / CA | 10 /
ZEISLER, Stefan K. 3949 West 36th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 2S7 / CA | 11 /
DODD, Maurice G. 46662 Crosby Place Chilliwack, British Columbia V2P 7X3 / CA | 12 /
MANUELA, Cornelia Hoehr 48 West 12 Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Y 1T5 / CA | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2022/46] |
Former [2019/13] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18187378.7 | 25.04.2013 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | US201261639408P | 27.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261639408 P | US201261640610P | 30.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261640610 P | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3461240 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3461240 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3461240 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H05H6/00, G21G1/10, C22B5/18, C22B34/30, C22B9/14, C25D13/02, G21K5/08, C25D13/22, // B22F9/22 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
C25D13/22 (EP,CN,US);
G21G1/10 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B22F1/145 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C25D13/02 (EP,CN,US);
G21C1/10 (RU);
G21F5/14 (EP,US);
G21G1/001 (CN,US);
G21K5/08 (US);
H05H6/00 (EP,RU,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
B22F7/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F1/145, B22F3/10 (EP,US,RU,CN);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/145, B22F9/22 (RU,CN,US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F9/22, B22F2201/013 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ZYKLOTRONHERSTELLUNG VON TECHNETIUM-99M | [2019/13] | English: | PROCESSES, SYSTEMS, AND APPARATUS FOR CYLOTRON PRODUCTION OF TECHNETIUM-99M | [2019/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET APPAREILS POUR LA PRODUCTION PAR CYLOTRON DE TECHNÉTIUM-99M | [2022/25] |
Former [2019/13] | PROCESSES, SYSTEMS, AND APPARATUS FOR CYCLOTRON PRODUCTION OF TECHNETIUM-99M | Examination procedure | 22.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 22.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13781369.7 / EP2841607 | EP16200459.2 / EP3197246 | Divisional application(s) | EP22207642.4 / EP4216680 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | BG | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | IE | 25.04.2023 | LU | 25.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/35] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
IE | 25.04.2023 | ||
LU | 25.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
IE | 25.04.2023 | ||
LU | 25.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 25.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 25.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 25.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2504585 (REID ALLEN F); | [X]WO2008073468 (MALLINCKRODT INC [US], et al); | Examination | US2499808 | US2011002431 |