blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3659594

EP3659594 - A STERILE SOLUTION WITH AN APPLICATION INJECTOR COMPRISING A MEDICAL AGENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.10.2020
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.06.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2024Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.10.2024Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stegemann, Klaus
Hackmackbogen 82
21035 Hamburg / DE
[2020/23]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2020/23]
Representative(s)Raffay & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Stephansplatz 2-6
20354 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/23]Raffay & Fleck
Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date18209583.630.11.2018
[2020/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3659594
Date:03.06.2020
Language:DE
[2020/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3659594
Date:18.11.2020
Language:DE
[2020/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2019
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/216, A61M5/178, // A61K9/08
[2020/23]
CPC:
A61K31/216 (EP); A61M5/3134 (EP,US); A61M5/315 (US);
A61K9/0019 (EP); A61M2005/3104 (EP,US); A61M2202/0007 (US);
A61M2205/0205 (US); A61M2210/1085 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/35]
Former [2020/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA05.10.2020
ME05.10.2020
TitleGerman:EINE STERILE LÖSUNG MIT EINEM MEDIZINISCHEN WIRKSTOFF ENTHALTENDE APPLIKATIONSSPRITZE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEREN BEREITSTELLUNG[2020/23]
English:A STERILE SOLUTION WITH AN APPLICATION INJECTOR COMPRISING A MEDICAL AGENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME[2020/23]
French:SERINGUE D'ADMINISTRATION DE SOLUTION STÉRILE COMPORTANT UNE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE MÉDICALE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION[2020/23]
Examination procedure05.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/23]
05.12.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.06.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2020Fee for grant paid
21.07.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.07.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.08.2021   
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Opponent's representative
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 [2021/38]
30.08.2021Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.01.2022Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.03.2023Date of oral proceedings
30.05.2023Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.05.2023Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.07.2023Appeal received No.  T1366/23
21.07.2023Payment of appeal fee
06.10.2023Statement of grounds filed
28.07.2023Appeal received No.  T1366/23
28.07.2023Payment of appeal fee
21.09.2023Statement of grounds filed
30.09.2025Date of oral proceedings
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.11.2020
MC18.11.2020
MT18.11.2020
SM18.11.2020
PT31.08.2022
[2022/48]
Former [2022/29]AL18.11.2020
MC18.11.2020
MT18.11.2020
SM18.11.2020
Former [2021/45]AL18.11.2020
MC18.11.2020
SM18.11.2020
Former [2021/40]MC18.11.2020
SM18.11.2020
Former [2021/32]SM18.11.2020
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2012166045  (CATHEASY VAESTERAAS AB [SE], et al);
 [Y]WO2014131742  (OTTO ULLRICH [DE]);
 [XY]US2016058715  (RAKESH THUMMAR [IN], et al);
 [A]WO2016187078  (CARILION CLINIC [US]);
 [A]WO2017085253  (FORMYCON AG [DE]);
OppositionES27122U
 US2703575
 DE3106988
 JPS6055447U
 EP0326361
 EP0390244
 WO9512482
 DE4438360
 JP2000116780
 US6065270
 DE10201110
 JP2004018379
 DE69814575T
 EP1442762
 WO2004075958
 CN2899813Y
 WO2012166045
 DE102011107764
 EP2594206
 WO2013184270
 US2014025017
 WO2014131742
 WO2014134577
 WO2015033349
 US2016058715
 EP3061477
 WO2016187078
 WO2017085253
 WO2017209800
 EP3338839
 WO2018122366
 WO2019151578
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.